Depot: Gloucester Horton Road
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Gloucester Horton Road | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2757 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | GLO | on | 15/06/1947 | SLO | Slough | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4383 | on | 01/01/1934 | Sw Wks | Swindon Works | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | GLO | m/e | 03/1936 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5524 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | GLO | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2039 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | LYD | Lydney | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | GLO | on | 15/06/1947 | LYD | Lydney |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2114 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | GLO | on | 15/06/1947 | LYD | Lydney | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2541 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | GLO | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 85 | |||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4564 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | GLO | on | 15/06/1947 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5531 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | GLO | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6623 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | GLO | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 1076 | 0-6-0ST | 1254 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | GLO | ||||||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2088 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | GLO | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | Exeter | ||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3153 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | TR | Truro | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | GLO | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2908 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | GLO | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7770 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | GLO | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4086 | on | 02/06/1936 | WOS | Worcester | on | 01/12/1937 | GLO | on | 22/06/1939 | WOS | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5092 | on | 07/04/1938 | GLO | m/e | 07/1943 | WOS | Worcester | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5042 | on | 17/10/1937 | WOS | Worcester | on | 27/05/1939 | GLO | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5050 | m/e | 05/1936 | WOS | Worcester (New) | on | 22/07/1939 | GLO | on | 13/11/1939 | EXE | Exeter |
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2938 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | GLO | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4578 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | GLO | on | 15/06/1947 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7312 | on | 01/01/1934 | 101 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | GLO | on | 15/06/1947 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7004 | on | 19/06/1946 (New) | GLO | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1943 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1989 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 09/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2009 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 01/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2248 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 87G | Carmarthen | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2515 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2656 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | on | 27/03/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2756 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2938 | 4w/e | 29/12/1945 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2980 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 31/05/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3153 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 02/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3164 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 03/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3171 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 07/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3175 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3204 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 07/1948 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3205 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 07/1948 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | ||||
Steam | Duke | 4-4-0 | 9064 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | ABH | Aberystwyth | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Duke | 4-4-0 | 9089 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 89A | Oswestry | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3609 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 08/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4059 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 09/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4082 | on | 08/02/1947 | 85 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | on | 13/01/1948 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4140 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 85A | Worcester | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4627 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4628 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4659 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1406 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | LYD | Lydney | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1413 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 03/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1424 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | LYD | Lydney | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1441 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 31/03/1948 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1464 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4977 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 84B | Oxley | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5042 | on | 27/05/1939 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | on | 02/02/1959 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5312 | on | 01/01/1934 | 194 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 84G | Shrewsbury | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5336 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 85 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 84B | Oxley | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5347 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5394 | on | 01/01/1934 | 85 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 85D | Kidderminster | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5398 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5697 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 30/04/1948 | DYD | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5793 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5951 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 85A | Worcester | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5965 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 81F | Oxford | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5980 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 85A | Worcester | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5988 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 85A | Worcester | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5990 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 81C | Southall | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6309 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | tn | Barnstaple | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6381 | on | 01/01/1934 | 76 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 86G | Pontypool Road | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6623 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | DYD | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6681 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | HFD | Hereford | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6917 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 84B | Oxley | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6940 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7004 | on | 19/06/1946 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | on | 30/09/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7723 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7741 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7815 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8701 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 85C | Hereford | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8717 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8731 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8781 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 85C | Hereford | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9727 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9776 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | CV.BRY | Barry | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3379 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 06/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 3440 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | m/e | 06/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8451 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79232 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 85A | Worcester | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2291 | on | 15/06/1947 | CARM | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | GLO | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2515 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | GLO | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | LYD | Lydney |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2254 | on | 15/06/1947 | CARM | Carmarthen | m/e | 31/03/1948 | GLO | m/e | 01/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 2651 | on | 15/06/1947 | HFD | Hereford | m/e | 31/03/1948 | GLO | on | 06/06/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1441 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | m/e | 31/03/1948 | GLO | m/e | 31/05/1948 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1441 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | m/e | 31/05/1948 | GLO | m/e | 06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6631 | on | 15/06/1947 | HFD | Hereford | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | GLO | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3163 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | GLO | m/e | 06/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7006 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 25/08/1948 | GLO | on | 14/10/1948 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Bird | 4-4-0 | 3445 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | GLO | m/e | 10/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7006 | on | 25/08/1948 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | on | 14/10/1948 | GLO | on | 20/01/1950 | SDN | Swindon |
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 2951 | on | 15/06/1947 | HFD | Hereford | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | GLO | m/e | 06/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4079 | on | 03/11/1948 | 85 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | GLO | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84A | Stafford Road | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6992 | on | 30/11/1948 (New) | GLO | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 85C | Hereford | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2281 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | KDR | Kidderminster | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | GLO | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | KDR | Kidderminster |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3848 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | GLO | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4996 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | GLO | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6921 | on | 15/06/1947 | WOS | Worcester | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | GLO | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1406 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | LYD | Lydney | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | GLO | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1409 | on | 15/06/1947 | LYD | Lydney | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | GLO | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | LYD | Lydney |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1424 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | LYD | Lydney | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | GLO | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 5112 | on | 15/06/1947 | KDR | Kidderminster | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | GLO | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8731 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | GLO | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5518 | on | 15/06/1947 | KDR | Kidderminster | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | GLO | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85D | Kidderminster |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5530 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | GLO | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4518 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | KDR | Kidderminster | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1623 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 87F | Llanelli | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5991 | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1625 | on | 02/08/1950 (New) | 85B | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1625 | on | 02/08/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road (New) | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 2339 | on | 15/06/1947 | WOS | Worcester | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2823 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4929 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6385 | on | 15/06/1947 | WOS | Worcester | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1627 | on | 16/08/1950 (New) | 85B | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2823 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4929 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 85B | on | 30/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6385 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1627 | on | 16/08/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road (New) | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7920 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7920 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 85B | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4140 | 4w/e | 30/09/1950 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4140 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5948 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7926 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5948 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7926 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6985 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | PDN | Old Oak Common | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 85B | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6985 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 85B | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5018 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 85A | Worcester | m/e | 01/1951 | 85B | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1630 | on | 13/01/1951 (New) | 85B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1631 | on | 19/01/1951 (New) | 85B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1632 | on | 23/01/1951 (New) | 85B | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1630 | on | 13/01/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road (New) | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1631 | on | 19/01/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road (New) | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 85B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 86C | Hereford |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1632 | on | 23/01/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road (New) | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 89A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2109 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | SRD | Stafford Road | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2025 | on | 15/06/1947 | LYD | Lydney | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2109 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2121 | on | 15/06/1947 | LYD | Lydney | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5018 | m/e | 01/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7824 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8731 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 85A | Worcester | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1639 | on | 05/03/1951 (New) | 85B | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 85A | Worcester | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2025 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 85B | m/e | 05/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2121 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 85B | m/e | 06/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8731 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9441 | on | 31/03/1951 (New) | 85B | m/e | 30/04/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1642 | on | 02/04/1951 (New) | 85B | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1642 | on | 02/04/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road (New) | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 85B | m/e | 01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2043 | on | 15/06/1947 | LYD | Lydney | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 85B | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2144 | on | 15/06/1947 | LYD | Lydney | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 85B | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5417 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | BAN | Banbury | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 85B | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1639 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 85A | Worcester | m/e | 30/04/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3848 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9441 | on | 31/03/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road (New) | m/e | 30/04/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9445 | on | 30/04/1951 (New) | 85B | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1639 | m/e | 30/04/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1996 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85B | m/e | 01/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4386 | m/e | 04/1948 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 (R) | 85B | |||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4586 | on | 15/06/1947 | KDR | Kidderminster | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85B | m/e | 04/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1409 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | LYD | Lydney | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5417 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85B | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6951 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 85C | Hereford | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9441 | m/e | 30/04/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85B | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9445 | on | 30/04/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road (New) | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85B | m/e | 01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7006 | on | 20/01/1950 | SDN | Swindon | on | 28/05/1951 | 85B | on | 26/02/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6936 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 85B | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6936 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 85B | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5018 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 85B | m/e | 10/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90524 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90691 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90524 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90691 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5017 | on | 15/06/1947 | WOS | Worcester | m/e | 10/1951 | 85B | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2144 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 85B | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2144 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3205 | m/e | 07/1948 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5017 | m/e | 10/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 85B | on | 21/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2295 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1409 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8717 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 85B | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2295 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 85B | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1409 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8717 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9464 | on | 31/01/1952 (New) | 85B | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1409 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9464 | on | 31/01/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road (New) | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2061 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7723 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7741 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1409 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1406 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 85B | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5408 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 85B | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2061 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 85B | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7723 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7741 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 85B | m/e | 12/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9471 | on | 30/04/1952 (New) | 85B | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1612 | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2295 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1406 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5408 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 85B | m/e | 12/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6341 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 85B | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1406 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 85B | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1406 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9475 | on | 30/06/1952 (New) | 85B | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2040 | on | 15/06/1947 | HFD | Hereford | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4659 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4664 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | WOS | Worcester | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5914 | on | 15/06/1947 | WOS | Worcester | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9475 | on | 30/06/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road (New) | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 83G | Penzance |
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 8488 | m/e | 12/1932 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 (R) | 85B | |||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1406 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 85B | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6330 | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 85B | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6373 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 85B | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7723 | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 85B | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1406 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6330 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 85B | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6373 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7723 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1401 | on | 20/08/1952 | 98S | on | 06/09/1952 | 85B | m/e | 11/1958 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5018 | m/e | 10/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | m/e | 10/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4627 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4659 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1406 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7723 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85E | Gloucester Barnwood |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2228 | on | 15/06/1947 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2274 | on | 15/06/1947 | WOS | Worcester | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | 31xx | 2-6-2T | 3101 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3203 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 85B | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4627 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4628 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1406 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5368 | on | 15/06/1947 | NEY | Neyland | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6355 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6690 | on | 15/06/1947 | WES | Westbury | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 85D | Kidderminster |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6924 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84D | Leamington | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9480 | on | 31/08/1952 | 85A | Worcester (New) | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5951 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 85B | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6349 | on | 15/06/1947 | HFD | Hereford | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6985 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 85B | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4628 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5018 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 85B | m/e | 03/1958 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6308 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHR | Chester West | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 85B | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4627 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 85B | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4659 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 85B | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1627 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 85B | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3180 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 85B | m/e | 10/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4659 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 85B | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90685 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 85B | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90573 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 85B | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90149 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 85B | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90691 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 85B | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2292 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 81F | Oxford | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 85B | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1409 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 83C | Exeter | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 85B | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8436 | on | 31/05/1953 | 86H | Aberbeeg (New) | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 85B | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7035 | m/e | 09/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury (New) | m/e | 09/1953 | 85B | on | 01/10/1956 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4521 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 85B | m/e | 12/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4113 | on | 15/06/1947 | TN | Taunton | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 85B | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4934 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 85B | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5907 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 85B | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6938 | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 85B | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 83C | Exeter |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7808 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 85B | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7810 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 85B | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2040 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 85B | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4131 | on | 15/06/1947 | PPRD | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 85B | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6365 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 85B | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5355 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 85B | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5518 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85D | Kidderminster | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 85B | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 85D | Kidderminster |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9438 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 85B | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6368 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 85B | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4148 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 85B | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75029 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 85B | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5418 | on | 15/06/1947 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 85B | m/e | 06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5514 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 85B | on | 09/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9441 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 85B | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6365 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 85B | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4358 | on | 15/06/1947 | NEY | Neyland | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 85B | m/e | 08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4961 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 85B | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5642 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 85B | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6326 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | HFD | Hereford | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 85B | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 85D | Kidderminster |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6334 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 85B | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3205 | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 85B | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8731 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 85D | Kidderminster | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 85B | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6865 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 85B | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1630 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 85B | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2278 | on | 15/06/1947 | WOS | Worcester | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 85B | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1430 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 85B | m/e | 09/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1616 | on | 13/12/1949 | LYD | Lydney (New) | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 85B | m/e | 10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2207 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 85D | Kidderminster | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 85B | m/e | 01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2809 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 85B | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2854 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 85B | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1428 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 85B | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5182 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 85B | m/e | 05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4553 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 85A | Worcester | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 85B | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4573 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82C | Swindon | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 85B | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6669 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84E | Tyseley | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 85B | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6690 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 85D | Kidderminster | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 85B | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 86C | Hereford |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5094 | on | 31/07/1956 | 82C | Swindon | on | 21/08/1956 | 85B | on | 25/06/1958 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6341 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 85B | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5162 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 85B | m/e | 07/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3740 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 85B | m/e | 01/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5157 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 85B | m/e | 07/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5413 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 85B | m/e | 10/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9492 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 85B | m/e | 06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8727 | on | 15/06/1947 | KDR | Kidderminster | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 85B | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84J | Croes Newydd |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90485 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 81C | Southall | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 85B | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90485 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 85B | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4100 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | KDR | Kidderminster | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 85B | m/e | 10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4139 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 85D | Kidderminster | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 85B | m/e | 07/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5165 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 85B | m/e | 02/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1461 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 85B | m/e | 05/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6394 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 85B | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 2P | Kidderminster |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1605 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 85B | m/e | 02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5105 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 85B | m/e | 10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5421 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 85B | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2251 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 85B | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4664 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 85B | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2281 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | HFD | Hereford | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5914 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6353 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 84B | Oxley |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4101 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 85B | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4175 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 85D | Kidderminster | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2251 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3848 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4123 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 85B | m/e | 11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6415 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 85B | m/e | 11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2201 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2280 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4085 | on | 15/04/1958 | 85A | Worcester | on | 20/05/1958 | 85B | on | 18/02/1960 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5071 | on | 20/03/1958 | 85A | Worcester | on | 20/05/1958 | 85B | on | 16/09/1959 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6669 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 85D | Kidderminster |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2829 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 85B | m/e | 02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7312 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 87G | Carmarthen |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7750 | on | 15/06/1947 | WOS | Worcester | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 85B | m/e | 01/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4165 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5177 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 84K | Chester West | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 84D | Leamington |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5198 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 84D | Leamington | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4116 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 85B | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1426 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6137 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 85B | on | 06/10/1963 | 2A | Tyseley |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5094 | on | 25/06/1958 | 82C | Swindon | on | 16/10/1958 | 85B | on | 30/06/1960 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3360 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5194 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 84D | Leamington |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1427 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 85B | m/e | 06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7227 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7235 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6354 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 85B | m/e | 02/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7809 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7815 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 85B | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 89C | Machynlleth |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3715 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 85B | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5198 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 85B | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 83E | St Blazey |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5763 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 85B | m/e | 05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2253 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 85B | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8743 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 85B | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3803 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 85B | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1467 | on | 15/06/1947 | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 85B | m/e | 04/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1472 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 85B | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6304 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 85B | m/e | 01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8701 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 85D | Kidderminster | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 85B | m/e | 03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7000 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | on | 15/05/1959 | 85B | on | 14/08/1962 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8421 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 85B | m/e | 12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8491 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 85B | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1409 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 85B | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1454 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 85B | m/e | 12/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2289 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 85B | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 89A | Oswestry |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1627 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85B | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4989 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85B | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5173 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85B | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5977 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85B | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6363 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85B | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9477 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85B | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6368 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 85B | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7319 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 85B | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7338 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 85B | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1431 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 85B | m/e | 04/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6368 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 85D | Kidderminster |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1647 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 87C | Danygraig | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2245 | on | 15/06/1947 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 85B | on | 27/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1433 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 85B | m/e | 01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8409 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 85D | Bromsgrove |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7035 | on | 16/02/1959 | 87E | Landore | on | 29/02/1960 | 85B | on | 12/11/1962 | 81F | Oxford |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2136 | on | 21/03/1960 (New) | 85B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9453 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 85B | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85D | Bromsgrove |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2137 | on | 30/03/1960 (New) | 85B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | To Store | |||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2138 | on | 05/04/1960 (New) | 85B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 82C | Swindon | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2139 | on | 11/04/1960 (New) | 85B | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 85A | Worcester | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2123 | on | 12/11/1959 | 87C | Danygraig (New) | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 5243 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4242 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6437 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 85B | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8729 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 85B | on | 05/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7003 | on | 02/12/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 16/06/1960 | 85B | on | 13/04/1964 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6419 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 86F | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4142 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6341 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 85B | m/e | 11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1426 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3986 | on | 13/08/1960 | 84E | Tyseley (New) | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | 8107 | on | 15/06/1947 | WTD | Whitland | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7808 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 84E | Tyseley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3987 | on | 20/08/1960 | 84E | Tyseley (New) | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 87C | Danygraig |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3990 | on | 09/09/1960 | 84E | Tyseley (New) | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3993 | on | 22/09/1960 | 84E | Tyseley (New) | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 85B | m/e | 01/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3989 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 85B | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3991 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 85B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4143 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 88A | Radyr | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5913 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5071 | on | 16/09/1959 | 85A | Worcester | on | 15/12/1960 | 85B | on | 24/02/1962 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3994 | on | 01/10/1960 | 84E | Tyseley (New) | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 85B | w/e | 11/08/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2289 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3721 | on | 15/06/1947 | DID | Didcot | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6126 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 81B | Slough | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 85B | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4163 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 88A | Radyr | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 85B | on | 30/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1473 | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 34E | Neasden | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 85B | m/e | 08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6696 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 85B | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5007 | on | 02/02/1959 | 82C | Swindon | on | 09/03/1961 | 85B | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3775 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 85B | m/e | 12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1440 | on | 15/06/1947 | EXE | Exeter | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 85B | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 89D | Oswestry |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2288 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 85B | m/e | 12/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2273 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 85B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7322 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 88J | Aberdare | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 85B | m/e | 11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5058 | on | 30/11/1959 | 83D | Laira | on | 11/09/1961 | 85B | on | 12/11/1962 | To Store | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5064 | on | 23/04/1958 | 82C | Swindon | on | 11/09/1961 | 85B | on | 21/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3973 | on | 25/06/1960 | 84E | Tyseley (New) | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 85B | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4106 | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 87G | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 85B | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4109 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 85B | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4974 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 85B | m/e | 04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5173 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 85B | m/e | 08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6956 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 85B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6993 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 85B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1650 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 85B | m/e | 02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1426 | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 85B | m/e | 04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5968 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 85B | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8489 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86H | Aberbeeg | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 85B | m/e | 02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7335 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 85B | m/e | 09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1626 | m/e | 10/1961 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 85B | m/e | 08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1630 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 85B | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5420 | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 85B | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7034 | on | 16/09/1960 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | on | 11/12/1961 | 85B | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3992 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 85B | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2232 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 85B | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 7435 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 85B | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8487 | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 85D | Bromsgrove | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 85B | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1608 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 83C | Exeter | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 85B | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4935 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 85B | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4956 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 85B | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6943 | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 85B | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5980 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 85B | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1440 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 85B | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5000 | on | 03/11/1955 | 82C | Swindon | m/e | 19/05/1962 | 85B | on | 02/11/1962 | 86C | Hereford |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5944 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 85B | m/e | 04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4614 | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 85B | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1453 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 85B | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47539 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 85B | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7000 | on | 14/08/1962 | 85A | Worcester | on | 30/08/1962 | 85B | on | 22/03/1963 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7026 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | SRD | Stafford Road | on | 07/09/1962 | 85B | on | 12/11/1962 | 84A | Stafford Road |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4161 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 85B | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 86C | Hereford |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5154 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 85B | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 86C | Hereford |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5184 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 84D | Leamington | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 85B | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4903 | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 84B | Oxley | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 85B | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5099 | on | 20/02/1962 | 85A | Worcester | on | 06/10/1962 | 85B | on | 12/11/1962 | To Store | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6940 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 85B | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6947 | on | 15/06/1947 | WOS | Worcester | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 85B | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6948 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 85B | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6989 | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 85B | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3745 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 85B | m/e | 12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7009 | on | 24/02/1962 | 85A | Worcester | on | 03/11/1962 | 85B | on | 17/12/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6344 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | on | 02/12/1962 | 85B | m/e | 11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4629 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 85D | Kidderminster | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 85B | m/e | 09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9798 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | 85B | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5199 | m/e | 03/1963 | Withdrawn | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 (R) | 85B | |||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4104 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 85B | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4611 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 85B | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1440 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 85B | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5914 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 85B | m/e | 01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5936 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 85B | m/e | 01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5979 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 85B | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6913 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 85B | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1455 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 84C | Banbury | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 85B | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1608 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 85B | on | 30/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4992 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 85B | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6319 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 82D | Westbury | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 85B | m/e | 08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3693 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 85B | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8471 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 85B | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3737 | on | 14/07/1963 | 88F | Treherbert | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 85B | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4624 | on | 14/07/1963 | 88F | Treherbert | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 85B | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4698 | on | 14/07/1963 | 88F | Treherbert | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 85B | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6368 | on | 14/07/1963 | 89C | Machynlleth | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 85B | m/e | 12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3633 | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms | on | 08/09/1963 | 85B | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1666 | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 87H | Neyland | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 85B | m/e | 02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4564 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 85B | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5518 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 83E | St Blazey | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 85B | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6349 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 85B | m/e | 08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6940 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 82C | Swindon | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 85B | m/e | 05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5330 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 89B | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 85B | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9620 | on | 06/10/1963 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 85B | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2196 | on | 08/06/1961 | 82C | Swindon (New) | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 85B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | To Store | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1451 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 83E | Yeovil Town | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 85B | m/e | 07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7307 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 85B | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1444 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 85B | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7319 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 85B | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75005 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 85B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 75025 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 85B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6346 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 85B | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1445 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1474 | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6128 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 81B | Slough | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6957 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6995 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73019 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | on | 01/11/1964 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73021 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73028 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | on | 01/11/1964 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73031 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73091 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | m/e | 05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73092 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73093 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73096 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | on | 01/11/1964 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78001 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | m/e | 12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78005 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78006 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | m/e | 12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43887 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 85C | Gloucester Barnwood | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44045 | on | 01/01/1948 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | w/e | 09/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44123 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85B | on | 03/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4958 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 85B | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4985 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 85B | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5545 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 81C | Southall | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 85B | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6928 | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 85B | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6942 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 85B | m/e | 12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7003 | on | 13/04/1964 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | on | 22/06/1964 | 85B | on | 10/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7318 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 85B | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7814 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 87F | Llanelli | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 85B | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7815 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 87F | Llanelli | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 85B | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1458 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 86C | Hereford | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 85B | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5042 | on | 13/04/1964 | 86C | Hereford | on | 20/07/1964 | 85B | on | 25/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5055 | on | 02/11/1963 | 86C | Hereford | on | 20/07/1964 | 85B | on | 28/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8749 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 85B | m/e | 10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9606 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 85B | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 78004 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 85B | on | 18/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4168 | on | 25/05/1962 | 82C | Swindon (New) | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 85B | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6346 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 85B | m/e | 09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6412 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 83E | Yeovil Town | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 85B | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4082 | on | 28/09/1963 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 24/08/1964 | 85B | on | 07/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9453 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 85D | Bromsgrove | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 85B | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 5054 | on | 13/04/1964 | 85A | Worcester | on | 14/09/1964 | 85B | on | 24/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7022 | on | 13/04/1964 | 85A | Worcester | on | 05/10/1964 | 85B | on | 25/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 7029 | on | 02/07/1962 | 81A | Old Oak Common | on | 05/10/1964 | 85B | m/e | 12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4698 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 85B | m/e | 10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1420 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 86C | Hereford | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 85B | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6113 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 88B | Radyr | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 85B | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7320 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 83B | Taunton | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 85B | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7926 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 82C | Swindon | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 85B | m/e | 12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8402 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 21C | Bromsgrove | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 85B | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8403 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 21C | Bromsgrove | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 85B | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8745 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 85B | m/e | 08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9606 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 85B | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9711 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 88B | Radyr | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 85B | m/e | 01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43887 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 85B | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2242 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 85C | Hereford | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 85B | m/e | 05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2287 | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 86C | Hereford | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 85B | m/e | 05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7808 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 82C | Swindon | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 85B | m/e | 12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7813 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 82C | Swindon | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 85B | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9790 | on | 15/06/1947 | SDN | Swindon | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 85B | w/e | 22/11/1964 | 83C | Westbury |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9430 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 88B | Radyr | w/e | 22/11/1964 | 85B | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44560 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | w/e | 22/11/1964 | 85B | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6113 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 85B | on | 18/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5992 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 83C | Westbury | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 85B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6128 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 81C | Southall | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 85B | m/e | 03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73068 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 85B | 2w/e | 11/04/1965 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3616 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 85B | m/e | 09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3643 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 85B | m/e | 10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3675 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 85B | m/e | 12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3677 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 85B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73001 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 85B | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44422 | w/e | 22/11/1964 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 2w/e | 07/02/1965 | 85B | on | 03/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92000 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 85B | on | 02/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92007 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 85B | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 88A | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92238 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 85B | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3759 | on | 08/09/1963 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 85B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4689 | 4w/e | 16/09/1963 | 70E | Salisbury | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 85B | m/e | 12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82030 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 85B | on | 02/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82039 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 85B | on | 02/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82040 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 85B | on | 02/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82042 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 85B | on | 06/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 82044 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 85B | on | 02/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44264 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 85B | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44269 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 85B | on | 03/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44560 | w/e | 22/11/1964 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 85B | m/e | 09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7814 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 85B | m/e | 09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7816 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 85B | on | 18/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | 7829 | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 81E | Didcot | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 85B | m/e | 12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6160 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 81C | Southall | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 85B | m/e | 12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3759 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 85B | m/e | 12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92007 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 85B | m/e | 12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92230 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 85B | m/e | 12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92244 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 85B | m/e | 12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92246 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 85B | m/e | 12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92250 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 85B | m/e | 12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3999 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 85B | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2126 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 82C | Swindon | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | 85B | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 16C | Derby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3186 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 85B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4162 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 85B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3998 | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 85B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3999 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | 85B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 82C | Swindon |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4120 | on | 28/02/1962 | 82C | Swindon (New) | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | 85B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 85A | Worcester |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3114 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | 82C | Swindon | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | 85B | w/e | 16/03/1974 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4025 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | 85B | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | AN | Allerton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3255 | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | 85B | on | 30/12/1972 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3601 | on | 24/10/1958 | 81A | Old Oak Common (New) | w/e | 30/12/1972 | 85B | m/e | 09/1981 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3964 | 2w/e | 13/01/1973 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 85B | m/e | 11/1981 | CF | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3010 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 71A | Eastleigh | w/e | 04/08/1973 | GL | w/e | 14/06/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08826 | w/e | 11/08/1973 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | w/e | 16/03/1974 | GL | on | 24/07/1988 | CL | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08281 | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 16C | Derby | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | GL | w/e | 13/12/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08849 | w/e | 28/09/1974 | NA | Newton Abbot | w/e | 13/12/1975 | GL | on | 01/10/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08185 | w/e | 20/09/1975 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 01/1977 | GL | m/e | 08/1977 | BR | Bristol Bath Road |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08338 | on | 01/02/1978 | BR | Bristol Bath Road | m/e | 11/1981 | GL | on | 15/07/1985 | Withdrawn |