Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 133 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6440 Week
» 21554 Month
» 324744 Year
» 1546309 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5697 m/e 01/1927

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 56xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 235
To Service During 01/1927
Withdrawal Thu 25/04/1963
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 36 yrs, 3 mths , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1927
81E Didcot 4w/e 03/10/1953
81F Oxford 4w/e 05/09/1959
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 26/03/1960
81E Didcot 4w/e 21/05/1960
88A Radyr 4w/e 16/07/1960
   Withdrawn on 25/04/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GLO Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 14/06/1947
ALLOC DYD Duffryn Yard m/e 30/04/1948
ALLOC CHYS Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 16/07/1949
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 05/09/1959
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 26/03/1960
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 21/05/1960
ALLOC 88A Radyr 4w/e 16/07/1960
WDN   4w/e 04/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1927 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5697
Built at Swindon Works
   
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
05/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
26/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
21/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
16/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88A)    
25/04/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5697    

prev prev