Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 251 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7258 Week
» 13392 Month
» 241276 Year
» 1462841 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Oxford


Depot Details
Depot Name Oxford
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
111187531/01/1946
OXF187531/01/1950
81F01/02/195005/05/1973
OX06/05/1973
Date Opened 01/04/1854
Date Closed 03/01/1966
Pre Grouping Company OWWR
Big 4 Company GWR
British Railways Region WR
GWR Division LONDON
1947 Directions The shed is on the west side of the line north of the station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn right out of the yard on the down (west) side of the station. Continue into Cripley Road, and then Abbey Street (cul-de-sac). Turn left along a cinder path at the end, and then right over the canal footbridge. Turn right along the towing path, and the shed entrance is about 20 yards further on the left.
Walking time 5 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
01/04/1854Depot opened
1875Change of code to 111
1875Change of code to OXF
01/02/1950Change of code to 81F
03/01/1966Depot closed
06/05/1973Change of code to OX