Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 216 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21250 Week
» 119895 Month
» 322559 Year
» 3349412 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2126 |
16/12/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/12/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by P Woods (Shipbreaking): Queenborough |
|
|
16/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2126 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
28/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
27/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
29/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
26/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2126 |
|
|