Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 3863 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17906 Week
» 82860 Month
» 285524 Year
» 3312377 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3116 |
m/e |
02/1905 |
Great Western Railway (51xx) |
5116 |
m/e |
05/1928 |
Great Western Railway (81xx) |
8107 |
m/e |
07/1939 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
3100/5100 |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
150 |
Works Number |
2071 |
To Service |
During 02/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 18/05/1962 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1910 |
Superheated boiler fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3116 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2071 |
|
|
10/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Superheated boiler fitted |
|
|
05/1928 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5116 |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
07/1939 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8107 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Whitland (WTD) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
12/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
18/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8107 |
|
|