|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1961 | Whitland MPD | 82008/30/42/4 have been allocated here. | SLS/196110 |
16/04/1963 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1064-73 (in various stages of construction), D1550 body built (Brush 2750 H.P. D.E.)- New Construction. D210/17, D305/10/16/30/36/43/73, D8003/14/18, 44675/89, 44756, 44810/28, 45410, 45531, 46515/22, 48404/44, 48526, 48680, 70016/23/46, 82042, 92035, 92127/46/52/53 92207/39. Outside Erecting Shop: 45322, 70035, 80136, For Butlin's Camp, Pwllheli 46100, For Butlin's Camp, Skegness 46203. Yard: 42182, 42426/69, 42592, 44877, 45067, 45126, 45481, 46106/08/23/27, 47380, 82036, 92104/201. Paint Shop and Outside: D1062/3, D57, D214, 44710, 44869, 45002/26/33/42, 45481, 46486, 48660, 92044/97/155 78002. Scrap Road: 46124/34/35. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/06/1955 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 82042 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Barry (88C) |
||
09/08/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) | ||
08/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E) | ||
07/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neyland (87H) | ||
04/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Taunton (83B) | ||
22/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (83D) | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) | ||
06/08/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 82042 | ||
02/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hayes: Bridgend |