Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4130 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17536 Week
» 70552 Month
» 190079 Year
» 3216932 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Bath Green Park (S&D)
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 8B | 1875 | 31/12/1910 | 8a | 01/01/1911 | 31/12/1922 | M8B | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 22C | 01/01/1923 | 28/02/1948 | 71G | 01/03/1948 | 31/01/1958 | 82F | 01/02/1958 | 28/02/1966 |
|
Date Opened |
04/08/1869 |
Date Closed |
07/03/1966 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
WR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the line west of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Turn right outside Bath L.M.S. Station along Midland Road. Turn
right into Lower Bristol Road and right again into Bridge Road. A.
cinder path leads to the shed from the right hand side of this road just
past the railway bridge. Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 04/08/1869 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to 8B | 01/01/1911 | Change of code to 8a | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to M8B | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 22C | 01/03/1948 | Change of code to 71G | 01/02/1958 | Change of code to 82F | 07/03/1966 | Depot closed |
|
|
|