Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 414 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14457 Week
» 79411 Month
» 282075 Year
» 3308928 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
6696 |
m/e |
10/1928 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
56xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
255 |
To Service |
During 10/1928 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/12/1963 |
Service Life |
35 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/02/1966 |
Woodham Bros. Yard, Barry |
5700 0-6-0PT-3612, 3738, 4612, 9629/81/2. 9400 0-6-0PT*9466. 4500 2-6-2T*-4561/6. 4575 2-6-2T*-4588, 5521/6/32/8/9/41/2/52/3/72. 5101 2-6-2T*-4110/5/21/41/4/56/60, 5164/93/9. 5600 0-6-2T-5619/37/68, 5693**, 6619/34/86/96. 4200 2-8-0T*-4247/8/53/70/7. 5205 2-8-0T*-5224/7/39. 7200 2-8-2T*7200/2/29. 4300 2-6-0*-5322, 7325. Hall 4-6-0*-4930/6/42/53/79/83, 5900/52/67/72. Modified Hall 4-6-0*-6989. 7903. Castle 4-6-0*-5029/43/51/80, 7027. King 4-6-0*-6023/4. 2800 2-8-0*-2807/57/9/61/73/4. 2884 2-8-0*-2885, 3802/3/14/7/22/45/50/5/62. Q 0-6-0*-30541. N 2-6-0-31874. U 2-6-0-31618/25/38, 31806. S15 4-6-0*-30499, 30506, 30825/8/30/41/7. WC and BB 4-6-2-34010/6/27/8/39/46/58/67/70/2/3/81/92/105. MN 4-6-2-35005/6/9/18/25. 4F 0-6-0 M.R.*-43924. 4F 0-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44123/422. SMT 4-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44901/5163/293/337/79/491. 8F 2-8-0-48173/431/518/624. S.D.J.R. 7F 2-8-0*-53808/9. Jubilee 4-6-0-45690/9. 4MT 2-6-0 B.R.-76017. 4MT 2-6-4T B1R.-80064/72/9/80/97/8/100/4/5/35/50. 9F 2-10-0-92207/14/9/40/5. Total: 152 locos. NOTES : * These 18 classes extinct on B.R. **5693 previously wrongly listed as 6692, even though latter was working at Stourbridge. The locos. above come from as far apart as Cornwall and Carlisle. |
SLS/196603 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1928 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 6696 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
11/01/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leamington (LMTN) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Banbury (BAN) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
30/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
02/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6696 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|