Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2671 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 13886 Week
» 4942 Month
» 351366 Year
» 3378219 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5408 |
m/e |
01/1932 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
54xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
277 |
To Service |
During 01/1932 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 18/12/1956 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 11 mths , 17 dys |
Total Mileage |
671,286 |
Information |
Arrived at Swindon for cutting on 2/1/1957 from Gloucester |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1932 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5408 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
26/01/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LDR) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Landore (LDR) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
18/12/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5408 |
|
|
26/01/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|