Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 239 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6023 Week
» 27412 Month
» 146939 Year
» 3173792 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
13255 |
08/06/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3255 |
26/01/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/06/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/06/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 13255 Built at Derby Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
26/01/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3255 |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
06/04/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
20/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
30/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Blazey (84B) |
|
|
27/09/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
11/03/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
30/12/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3255 from Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|