Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 788 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18591 Week
» 71607 Month
» 191134 Year
» 3217987 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
8729 |
m/e |
01/1931 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
W.G. Bagnall |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2426 |
To Service |
During 01/1931 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 05/12/1962 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 11 mths , 4 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1931 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 8729 Built at W.G. Bagnall, Works Number 2426 |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (STB) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Banbury (BAN) |
|
|
11/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (84K) |
|
|
31/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester West (84K) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
14/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
05/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 8729 |
|
|
08/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|