Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 755 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14161 Week
» 67177 Month
» 186704 Year
» 3213557 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4025 |
10/07/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08857 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/1975 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/07/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
05/1975 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4025 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
24/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08857 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (AN) |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
05/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
21/10/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08857 from Bescot (BS) |
|
|
02/11/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|