|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/01/1962 | Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works (Works Yard) | 1017(89A), 1639, 1650, 3200, 3622, 3631, 3831, 4154, 4270(88A), 4555(83A), 4645, 4663, 4946(89A), 5254(87B), 5658, 5957(81F), 6125, 6137, 6326, 6976/9, 7248, 7329, 7439, 8753(81C), 9612/23/46, 82041, 92227(88A). Works Yard: 2287(89C), D3028, D3979. Waiting Works: 3708(86G), 4179(84A), 4608(81C), 6150(81F), 6972(82B), 6992(85A), 75024(84E). | SLS/196203 |
04/03/1962 | Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 1011 (82B), 2287 (89C), 3622, 3677 (82B), 3692 (87B), 3708 (86G), 3833 (86A), 4122 (87H), 4179, 4696, 5774, 5901/77, 6110, 6125 (87H), 6137/50, 6326 (88A), 6972 (82B), 6974/6/92, 7200 (87F), 7236, 7804 (87G), 9623 (82B), 9782, 75024, 92227 (88A). Works Yard: 1451 (83C), 2268 (82D), 2856, 4140, 4608, 7807 (89D), 9633 (83C), D3037, D3977. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/01/1936 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 2287 Built at Swindon Works |
||
07/03/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Croes Newydd (CNYD) | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Croes Newydd (CNYD) | ||
23/04/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brecon (BCN) | ||
26/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oswestry (89A) | ||
05/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) | ||
19/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) | ||
29/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neyland (87H) | ||
28/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (86E) | ||
22/02/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hereford (86C) | ||
08/11/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) | ||
21/05/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2287 | ||
09/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |