Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 1370 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 20281 Week
» 85235 Month
» 287899 Year
» 3314752 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5270 |
m/e |
04/1926 |
Great Western Railway (Rblds) |
7235 |
on |
03/01/1936 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
G. Churchward |
Class |
42xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-8-0T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
233 |
To Service |
During 04/1926 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 20/04/1964 |
Service Life |
38 yrs , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/04/1958 |
Bromsgrove MPD |
In the absence of the 2-10-0, G.W. 7235 was tried out on 18th April et seq but fouled the platform and also ' dropped a brick arch;' on 7th May 2-8-0T 5226 arrived for trials and commenced work 'banking' up the Lickey, mid-morning. |
SLS/195805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1926 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5270 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
03/01/1936 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7235 |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Pontypool Road (PPRD) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Pontypool Road (PPRD) |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
19/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
21/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
20/04/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7235 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|