Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2038 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19841 Week
» 72857 Month
» 192384 Year
» 3219237 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
78004 |
on |
21/01/1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
31/01/1953 |
ALLOC |
89A |
Oswestry |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
89C |
Machynlleth |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
ALLOC |
82C |
Swindon |
5w/e |
30/01/1954 |
ALLOC |
85C |
Hereford |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
ALLOC |
87F |
Llanelli |
4w/e |
27/01/1964 |
ALLOC |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
3w/e |
20/07/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
7w/e |
07/11/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
18/11/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
08/02/1953 |
Swindon Works |
Arrivals from Darlington for fitting of A.T.C. Gear and other W.R. modifications, 78002. Tender B.R. 3. 941/52. 78003. Tender B.R. 3. 942/52 and 78004. Tender B.R. 3. 943/52, these are due to be allocated to the Central Wales Division. Dean 0-6-0s withdrawn from scrapping, noted in East Yard, Reception Shed, Dump and C. Shop : 2350 -; 2401 (89B); 2408 -; 2449 (89A); 2462 -; 2468 (89B); 2515 (85C); 2534 (82D); 2537 (86C); 2543, 2573 (81D). Eastern Region 60845 was noted fitted with Indicator Shelter on front end. |
SLS/195304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/01/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 78004 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Oswestry (89A) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C) |
|
|
30/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
13/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (85C) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
20/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
18/11/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 78004 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|