|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 15/03/1950 | 04/05/1950 | 51 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 4019 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
104646 | |
Swindon Works | 23/10/1951 | 30/11/1951 | 39 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6693 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2676 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
193297 | |
Swindon Works | 14/03/1952 | 25/04/1952 | 43 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4629 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2747 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1359789 | |
Swindon Works | 25/05/1953 | 05/08/1953 | 73 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2720 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1437521 | |
Swindon Works | 15/07/1954 | 18/08/1954 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Swindon Works | 28/03/1955 | 10/05/1955 | 44 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6669 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2412 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1513096 | |
Swindon Works | 18/08/1955 | 26/09/1955 | 40 days | Light Casual | Tender number 4076 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 25/05/1956 | 16/11/1956 | 176 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7670 (Diagram HD) Tender number 4059 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1567482 | |
Swindon Works | 28/11/1956 | 06/12/1956 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Swindon Works | 19/03/1958 | 12/05/1958 | 55 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2844 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1649611 | |
Swindon Works | 02/03/1960 | 06/05/1960 | 66 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7657 (Diagram HD) |
1745337 | |
Swindon Works | 01/02/1962 | 09/04/1962 | 68 days | Light Intermediate | Tender number 2842 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1820180 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/11/1961 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | 'A' Shop: D603, D825/32/56, D1000-12, D2175-7, D2383/4, D3032, D6320, 1010/15/24, 2832, 4003/82/92/5, 4706, 4903/18/32/76/89, 5073/8/87/96/8, 5974/6, 6014/26/8, 6345, 6826/45, 6909/33/55/81, 7015/21/2/34, 7232, 7322 (being cut up), 7805, 7915, 9400, 13115, 13353/5/62, 15100, 73027, 82004/35, 92233/41/5. Works Sidings: L90, 8, 1006/23, 2215, 3838/9, 4075/83, 4207, 4945, 5071, 5950/98, 6019, 6309/29/38, 6820, 6915/64, 7002, 7901/17, 8787, 9705, 75005, 78008, 92212. Triangle: 1606/15, 4563/5, 5039, 5538, 6415, 6993, 7417, 7787, 8772, 9739. Dump: 1433, 5332, 6700, 8706, 9745/9. 'C' Shop: 6392, 7775 intact. Outside Stock Shed: 5815, 6357, 6900. Weigh House: 5938/55. Outside Weigh House: D831/53, D6303, D7010. Works Shunters: 5756/80, 7756, 8721/62. | SLS/196201 |
17/03/1963 | Swindon Works (Works Yard) | Triangle: 4612, 4915, 5027/95, 5931, 6112, 8472. Works Yard: 3769/84, 4082, 5072/78, 5659, 6011/18/25/26, 6369, 6815, 6933, 7314, 8773/76, 9725, D6352. Weigh House: 6944, 7822. 'C' Shop: W.D. 71528. Dump: 2883, 4939, 5023, 6101, 6342/48, 6422, 6962, 8770, 9652, 9727/44/47/59/75, 7334. Dismantling Shed: 5020. 'A' Shop: D35, D101, D809, D813/18, D825/29, D1001/7/11/35. D1018-27 new - in various stages of oonstruction, D3189, D3365/98, D3424, D3505/06/22/25, D4000, D6311, D7002/32/38, 3687, 3755, 3836, 4623/73/77, 5006, 5775, 6855, 6918/22/61/72, 7919/25/28, 8109, 8433/81, 9437, 9648/66/80, 15100/05. Stock Shed: D7072 New. On Running Shed: 6000. Ex Works: 3837, 6819/78, 7913, 8459, 9405. | SLS/196304 |
24/04/1963 | Derby MPD (Works Yard) | 42636 was badly damaged when it fell into the pit at Derby on 24th April. It is now on works undergoing assessment. | SLS/196304 |
18/08/1963 | Swindon Works (Yard) | Triangle: 1432, 6437, 5679, 8444/86/91/94/96, 8766, 9401/79/83, 9715, D3103. Yard: 1621, 3668, 3711, 3826, 4082, 4175, 4265/98, 5645, 5933, 6011/25/26, 6159, 6815/19/28/35, 6931/32/61/78, 7909, 8738, 9412/40. 'A' Shop: D1023-26 (New in various stages of construction), D603, D801/4/40/61/2, D1004/9/16/9/50/63, D6305, D7075, 3605, 3738, 3850, 4115/57/68, 5971, 6000/18, 6129/65, 6809/15/37/68, 6937/44/78/94, 7902/27, 8403, 9662, 92246, Birmingham Pullman, uW60096. Top end of 'A' Shop: 15100/1/3, D3509/94/95, D3195, D3600, and N.C.B. 0-6-2 T. 67 (ex T.V.R.). Dismantling Shed: 5644, 5945. Dump: 3795, 4074, 5101/92, 5201, 5912/31, 7;412, 8783/91, 9713. Weigh House: D604, D808, 3823. On shed ex-Works: 9607, 9666. In store on shed: 1019, 2250, 2890, 3780, 3842, 4079, 4631, 4909, 4948, 5017, 5357, 5525/70, 5815, 5943, 9604 an W21. | SLS/196309 |
27/10/1963 | Swindon Works (Yard) | Triangle: 3653, 4507, 4690, 9645. Yard: D829/50/69, D1056, 3652/68, 3766/9, 4082, 4113/76, 5093, 6000/11/25/26, 6763 6819/58/61, 6922/23/61, 7803/08, 8738, 9412/40, 9633, 9700/99. 'A' Shop: D833/4/45/61, D1000/1/7/25/6/8/36/40/54/63/7, D3102, D3510/1/2/9, D3599/604/809, D7039, 4121/50/61, 6116, 6820/35, 6864/66/72/6, 6947/59/80, 7922, 9605, 9673. Dump: 1471, 1608, 4134, 4629/51, 5201, 5645, 5787, 6416, 6609/31/9/74, 8491, 8791, 9401, 9636, 9764. | SLS/196312 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/07/1948 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 7013, name: BRISTOL CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g Diagram HC boiler fitted |
||
15/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/03/1950. Dep: 04/05/1950. Work undertaken: Tender number 4019 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 23/10/1951. Dep: 30/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6693 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2676 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/02/1952 | Naming | Renamed 'WINDSOR CASTLE' | ||
22/02/1952 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4082 | ||
14/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 14/03/1952. Dep: 25/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4629 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2747 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
25/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/05/1953. Dep: 05/08/1953. Work undertaken: Tender number 2720 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/07/1954. Dep: 18/08/1954. | ||
28/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/03/1955. Dep: 10/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6669 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2412 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/08/1955. Dep: 26/09/1955. Work undertaken: Tender number 4076 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 25/05/1956. Dep: 16/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7670 (Diagram HD) Tender number 4059 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/11/1956. Dep: 06/12/1956. | ||
02/08/1957 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4085 | ||
09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
19/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/03/1958. Dep: 12/05/1958. Work undertaken: Tender number 2844 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 02/03/1960. Dep: 06/05/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7657 (Diagram HD) |
||
06/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
06/08/1960 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 2427 | ||
20/05/1961 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 2731 | ||
01/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 01/02/1962. Dep: 09/04/1962. Work undertaken: Tender number 2842 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/1963 | To Store | To Store at Worcester (85A) | ||
28/09/1963 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
24/08/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) | ||
07/09/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 4082 from Gloucester Horton Road (85B) | ||
06/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |