Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 492 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19403 Week
» 84357 Month
» 287021 Year
» 3313874 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Tondu
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Tondu |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | TDU (146) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 86F | 01/02/1950 | 09/09/1960 | 88H | 10/09/1960 | 29/02/1964 |
|
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
GWR Division |
NEWPORT |
1947 Directions |
The shed is in the fork of the Maesteg and Ogmore Valley lines at
the north end of the station. The yard is partially visible from these
lines.
A boarded crossing leads from the station to the shed. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 146 | 1875 | Change of code to TDU | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 86F | 10/09/1960 | Change of code to 88H |
|
|
|