Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1439 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19242 Week
» 72258 Month
» 191785 Year
» 3218638 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3991 |
09/09/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08823 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1976 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
09/1976 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/09/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
09/1976 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3991 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
09/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08823 |
|
|
07/08/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
09/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
09/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (SW) |
|
|
02/08/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|