Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 5011 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20623 Week
» 119268 Month
» 321932 Year
» 3348785 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
4143 |
on |
05/09/1946 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
5101 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
335 |
To Service |
Mon 05/09/1946 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/06/1964 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 9 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1958 |
Bristol Bath Road MPD |
Standard tanks 82035/6/7/9 have moved here from Radyr June. where they have been replaced by GWR4143/52/60/3/4 which have been displaced at Rhymney by diesel railcars. |
SLS/195807 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/09/1946 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 4143 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Bath Road (BRD) |
|
|
03/11/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
01/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D) |
|
|
31/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D) |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88A) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B) |
|
|
12/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (83B) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
15/06/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 4143 |
|
|
11/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|