Depot: West Auckland
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | by | 01/01/1923 | 1646 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | by | 01/01/1923 | 1654 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | H | 12/1935 | 1221 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | H | 12/1935 | 1550 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/12/1939 | 687 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/01/1940 | 1500 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/01/1940 | 1521 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/01/1940 | 1531 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/01/1940 | 2147 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/01/1940 | 2162 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/01/1940 | 690 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/01/1940 | 693 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 27/05/1940 | 1517 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/06/1940 | 2156 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/01/1941 | 1521 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/03/1941 | 652 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 02/12/1941 | 690 | Transfer out to: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 14/02/1942 | 2147 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/02/1942 | 687 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/02/1942 | 693 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/02/1943 | 2156 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/01/1944 | 694 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 24/10/1944 | 693 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 05/03/1945 | 693 | Transfer out to: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/06/1945 | 2155 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/10/1945 | 694 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 26/11/1945 | 2155 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/08/1946 | 3314 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 29/09/1946 | 1527 | Transfer in from: | SCA | Scarborough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 29/09/1946 | 2149 | Transfer in from: | WBY | Whitby | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/01/1947 | 4938 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/01/1947 | 4938 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/04/1947 | 9869 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5032 | Snapshot | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5061 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5064 | Snapshot | WHD | Wearhead | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5075 | Snapshot | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5659 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5662 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5675 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5677 | Snapshot | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5683 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5687 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5689 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5696 | Snapshot | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5706 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5718 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5851 | Snapshot | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 65665 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 65715 | Snapshot | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7306 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7312 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7317 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7345 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8142 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8145 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8149 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8182 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8249 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8254 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8255 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8269 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8678 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8696 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9418 | Snapshot | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9422 | Snapshot | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9426 | Snapshot | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/01/1948 | 4778 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/01/1948 | 4848 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 04/01/1948 | 3314 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 04/01/1948 | 3315 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 4778 | Transfer in from: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 4848 | Transfer in from: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 4778 | Transfer out to: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 4848 | Transfer out to: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 9422 | Transfer out to: | SUN | Sunderland | ||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 9422 | Transfer in from: | SUN | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/01/1948 | 5057 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/01/1948 | 5084 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/01/1948 | 5089 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/01/1948 | 5092 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/01/1948 | 5675 | Transfer out to: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 5646 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 5675 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | D7 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 5683 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 5696 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 5718 | Transfer out to: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 65715 | Transfer out to: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 5671 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 30/05/1948 | 9877 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 30/05/1948 | 9879 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 06/1948 | 7306 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 7242 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 7333 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/08/1948 | 5032 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 5077 | Transfer in from: | KBY | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 5089 | Transfer out to: | KBY | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 5097 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 68691 | Transfer in from: | SUN | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 68678 | Transfer out to: | SUN | Sunderland | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 02/01/1949 | 69868 | Transfer in from: | SALT | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 69868 | Transfer in from: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 69868 | Transfer out to: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 65083 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 65123 | Transfer in from: | SBH | Blyth (South) | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/02/1949 | 69872 | Transfer in from: | SALT | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/02/1949 | 69875 | Transfer in from: | SALT | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 69872 | Transfer in from: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 69875 | Transfer in from: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 67317 | Transfer out to: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 69872 | Transfer out to: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 69875 | Transfer out to: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 65037 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 65083 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 7333 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1949 | 65665 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 9422 | Transfer out to: | CON | Consett | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 67294 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 67242 | Transfer out to: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1950 | 65123 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 65102 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1950 | 65037 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/04/1950 | 65646 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 20/05/1950 | 65091 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/05/1950 | 69851 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 04/06/1950 | 69886 | Transfer out to: | 50E | Scarborough | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/07/1950 | 65084 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/07/1950 | 64756 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | on | 30/07/1950 | 5696 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/08/1950 | 65078 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 65088 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1950 | 65057 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 22/10/1950 | 67291 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 22/10/1950 | 67294 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 65696 | Transfer in from: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 67291 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 65696 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 67291 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 65696 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 65696 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 65062 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 65062 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 65062 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/02/1951 | 65659 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 65691 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 65691 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 65691 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1951 | 65687 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 67242 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 67324 | Transfer in from: | NLN | Northallerton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 67291 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 67345 | Transfer out to: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 67242 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 67324 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 67242 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 67324 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1951 | 46470 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 08/1951 | 46473 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1951 | 46479 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 65691 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/1951 | 46482 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 65675 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 65683 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/11/1951 | 65102 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 68182 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 8142 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1951 | 65677 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 67278 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 67342 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 67242 | Transfer out to: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 67324 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 67278 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 67342 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 67278 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 67342 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 67318 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/08/1952 | 68255 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 67273 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/08/1952 | 64940 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/08/1952 | 64982 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 64940 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 64982 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 69018 | Transfer in from: | SUN | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 64940 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 64982 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 68707 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 69018 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 67273 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 69018 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68707 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68707 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 62359 | Transfer in from: | NLN | Northallerton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 67273 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 67344 | Transfer in from: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 67278 | Transfer out to: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 67342 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 67273 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 67344 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 62359 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 67273 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 67344 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 67331 | Transfer in from: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 67312 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 01/1953 | 68249 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 67331 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 67331 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 67273 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 67344 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 23/02/1953 | 67331 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 68692 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 67318 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/08/1953 | 65077 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 65697 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 12/1953 | 78010 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 12/1953 | 78011 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1954 | 78012 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1954 | 78013 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 65708 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 65092 | Transfer out to: | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 02/1954 | 78014 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 02/1954 | 78015 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 03/1954 | 78016 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 03/1954 | 78017 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 03/1954 | 78018 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 65061 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 65078 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 65696 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 78016 | Transfer out to: | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 78017 | Transfer out to: | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 78018 | Transfer out to: | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/05/1954 | 65689 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1954 | 77000 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1954 | 77001 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1954 | 77002 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1954 | 77003 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/08/1954 | 77011 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/08/1954 | 77004 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/08/1954 | 77010 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 29/08/1954 | 63351 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 29/08/1954 | 63459 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/08/1954 | 64756 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/08/1954 | 64848 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 65088 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 65706 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 46472 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 46479 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 65697 | Transfer out to: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/12/1954 | 65062 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/12/1954 | 65097 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 65064 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 46471 | Transfer in from: | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 46480 | Transfer in from: | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 22/01/1955 | 77012 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 46470 | Transfer out to: | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 46472 | Transfer out to: | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 65091 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 22/01/1955 | 77004 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/03/1955 | 64756 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/03/1955 | 64817 | Transfer in from: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/03/1955 | 64848 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/03/1955 | 64862 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/03/1955 | 64910 | Transfer in from: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 78010 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 78011 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 78012 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 78013 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 78014 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/04/1955 | 64756 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/04/1955 | 64848 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 46476 | Transfer in from: | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 46481 | Transfer in from: | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/05/1955 | 77011 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 43056 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 43057 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 43071 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 43075 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 43125 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 46471 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 46473 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 46476 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 77000 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 77001 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 77010 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/06/1955 | 64756 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/06/1955 | 64848 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 68242 | Transfer in from: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 68696 | Transfer out to: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 68145 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1955 | 64817 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1955 | 64910 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1955 | 64940 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 65731 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 65733 | Transfer in from: | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 65735 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 46471 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 65708 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1955 | 77012 | Transfer out to: | 50G | Whitby | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 65662 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 68685 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 68707 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/06/1956 | 64927 | Transfer in from: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 76021 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 76024 | Transfer in from: | 52c | Alston | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 76045 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 76046 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 76049 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 43056 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 43057 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 43071 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 43075 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 43125 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 76050 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/11/1956 | 64978 | Transfer in from: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 78015 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 68295 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 15/09/1957 | 69872 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 07/11/1957 | 69868 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | on | 13/01/1958 | 68149 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 78016 | Transfer in from: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 46471 | Transfer out to: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/06/1958 | 63353 | Transfer in from: | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/06/1958 | 63398 | Transfer in from: | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 68235 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 68959 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 22/06/1958 | 69870 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 22/06/1958 | 69875 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 68724 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 04/08/1958 | 68242 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 46480 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 46481 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 26/10/1958 | 63340 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 26/10/1958 | 63403 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/11/1958 | 69851 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/01/1959 | 65733 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 68959 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 23/02/1959 | 68295 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 69007 | Transfer in from: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 63407 | Transfer in from: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 63443 | Transfer in from: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 63446 | Transfer in from: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 76024 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/08/1959 | 64978 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 46482 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 02/12/1959 | 69856 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 46471 | Transfer in from: | 51J | Northallerton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/09/1960 | 64719 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/09/1960 | 64835 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/09/1960 | 64778 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 68675 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 68708 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 69002 | Transfer in from: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 46471 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 03/10/1960 | 68685 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 14/10/1960 | 68269 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 68688 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/10/1960 | 64969 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/10/1960 | 64979 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 07/11/1960 | 68235 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 07/11/1960 | 68254 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 19/12/1960 | 68691 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 19/12/1960 | 68724 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 69002 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 69007 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 69018 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 68675 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 68688 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 11/08/1961 | 68708 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 02/10/1961 | 68692 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/10/1961 | 64862 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/12/1961 | 64818 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/12/1961 | 64859 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/01/1962 | 64979 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/04/1962 | 63347 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/04/1962 | 63361 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/04/1962 | 63341 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/04/1962 | 63343 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/04/1962 | 64859 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/04/1962 | 64927 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/06/1962 | 63355 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/06/1962 | 63373 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/06/1962 | 64719 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/06/1962 | 64756 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/06/1962 | 64818 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/06/1962 | 64969 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/06/1962 | 65731 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J26 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/06/1962 | 65735 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 25/11/1962 | 63374 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1962 | 64835 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1962 | 64848 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1962 | 64982 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 78025 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 77002 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/03/1963 | 63375 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/04/1963 | 77010 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/04/1963 | 63374 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/06/1963 | 63388 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/07/1963 | 63340 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/07/1963 | 63353 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/07/1963 | 63355 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/07/1963 | 63373 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 78016 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 19/08/1963 | 63375 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/10/1963 | 63388 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/10/1963 | 63459 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 43138 | Transfer in from: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 43141 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 78025 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 43140 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 43133 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 76021 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 76045 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 76046 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 76049 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 76050 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 24/11/1963 | 63341 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 24/11/1963 | 63351 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 24/11/1963 | 63403 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 43140 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/01/1964 | 63347 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/02/1964 | 63343 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/02/1964 | 63361 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/02/1964 | 63398 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/02/1964 | 63407 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/02/1964 | 63443 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/02/1964 | 63446 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/02/1964 | 77003 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/02/1964 | 77010 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 43133 | Transfer out to: | 50D | Goole | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 43138 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 43141 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |