Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1281 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19084 Week
» 72100 Month
» 191627 Year
» 3218480 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
46481 |
m/e |
10/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2173 |
To Service |
During 10/1951 to Kirkby Stephen (51H) |
Withdrawal |
Fri 14/12/1962 |
Service Life |
11 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
16/10/1958 |
Malton - Driffield branch |
The last through goods was worked (both ways) by 46481 on 16th October; the section Malton-Fimber had its last goods train on Saturday, 18th October. All sidings are to be removed. |
SLS/195811 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 46481 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2173 Allocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
16/08/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
04/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Malton (50F) |
|
|
14/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46481 |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|