Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2263 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25894 Week
» 90848 Month
» 293512 Year
» 3320365 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1574 |
m/e |
09/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5097 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
65097 |
on |
23/12/1950 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1955 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
AUK |
West Auckland |
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
13/12/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1906 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
03/1918 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
03/1918 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/11/1954 |
Darlington (Bank Top) MPD |
New class '3' 2-6-2T Nos. 82026/7 are working from Bank Top Loco. on the Darlington-Penrith passenger service, and are proving very popular with the enginemen, the winter load of three bogies being well within their capacity. It is many years since tank engines worked over the Stainmore road, and I believe it is the first time the passenger trains have been so hauled. It was intended to use the N.E.R. 4-4-4T of 'class 'D' over the route when they came out in 1913, but were found to be too heavy for the viaducts at Deepdale and Belah. The new arrivals will no doubt mean the end of the 'J21' engines, and Nos. 65038/62/89/97, an 65100 are awaiting decision at the works. No. 65100 is the last one from Kirkby Stephen shed; they will probably get a 2-6-2T in place of her. |
SLS/195501 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1574 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 158 |
|
|
11/1906 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
|
|
03/1918 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
|
03/1918 |
Modification |
Modification: Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5097 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK) |
|
|
23/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65097 |
|
|
13/12/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65097 from West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
01/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|