|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 09/05/1923 | 27/09/1923 | 142 days | General | Boiler number D172 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1925 | 27/01/1926 | 93 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/10/1928 | 21/11/1928 | 50 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1931 | 17/05/1931 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 2394 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1934 | 30/06/1934 | 33 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1936 | 03/12/1936 | 67 days | General | Boiler number AW21 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1939 | 19/04/1939 | 49 days | General | Boiler number D1945 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1939 | 03/05/1939 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1941 | 29/04/1941 | 95 days | General | Boiler number 2157 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1943 | 12/05/1943 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2384 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 22/05/1945 | 11/06/1945 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1946 | 19/09/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3013 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 12/10/1947 | 28/10/1947 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/01/1949 | 11/02/1949 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24209 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63341 |
||
Darlington Works | 06/11/1951 | 01/12/1951 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gateshead Works | 16/09/1952 | 13/10/1952 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/03/1954 | 10/04/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24167 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1955 | 05/01/1956 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 29/01/1957 | 08/03/1957 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 24278 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1957 | 15/11/1957 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1961 | 13/05/1961 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24202 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/05/1961 | 26/05/1961 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1961 | 09/06/1961 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1962 | 07/12/1962 | 44 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
04/06/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1248 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Selby (SEL) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
09/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1923. Dep: 27/09/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number D172 (Diagram 50) |
||
25/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
27/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1925. Dep: 27/01/1926. | ||
03/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1928. Dep: 21/11/1928. | ||
27/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1931. Dep: 17/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2394 (Diagram 50) |
||
29/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1934. Dep: 30/06/1934. | ||
28/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1936. Dep: 03/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW21 (Diagram 50) |
||
02/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1939. Dep: 19/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1945 (Diagram 50) |
||
20/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1939. Dep: 03/05/1939. | ||
25/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1941. Dep: 29/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2157 (Diagram 50) |
||
13/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1943. Dep: 12/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2384 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/05/1945. Dep: 11/06/1945. | ||
14/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3341 | ||
22/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1946. Dep: 19/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3013 (Diagram 50A) |
||
12/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/10/1947. Dep: 28/10/1947. | ||
07/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
18/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1949. Dep: 11/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24209 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63341 |
||
06/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/11/1951. Dep: 01/12/1951. | ||
16/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/09/1952. Dep: 13/10/1952. | ||
08/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24167 (Diagram 50A) |
||
29/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/11/1955. Dep: 05/01/1956. | ||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G) | ||
29/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1957. Dep: 08/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24278 (Diagram 50A) |
||
31/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/10/1957. Dep: 15/11/1957. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
14/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1961. Dep: 13/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24202 (Diagram 50A) |
||
19/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/05/1961. Dep: 26/05/1961. | ||
01/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/06/1961. Dep: 09/06/1961. | ||
08/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
25/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/10/1962. Dep: 07/12/1962. | ||
24/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
12/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63341 from West Hartlepool (51C) |