Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 835 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14241 Week
» 67257 Month
» 186784 Year
» 3213637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
77000 |
on |
09/02/1954 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/02/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 77000 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Darlington (51A ) |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |
|
|
28/12/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
01/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
05/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
13/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourton (55B) |
|
|
07/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 77000 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|