Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 290 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18093 Week
» 71109 Month
» 190636 Year
» 3217489 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Motherwell
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Motherwell |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 28A | 1884 | 31/12/1948 | 66B | 01/01/1949 | 30/04/1967 | ML | 06/05/1973 | 17/06/1968 |
|
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the Coatbridge line north of the
station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside the station along Muir Street (main road). Turn
first right after crossing the railway bridge. This is a rough cul-de-sac,
and the shed entrance is at the end. Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 01/01/1930 | Change of code to 28A | 01/01/1949 | Change of code to 66B | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to ML |
|
|
|