|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/1922 | General | ||||||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1924 | 29/11/1924 | 66 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1927 | 23/02/1928 | 81 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1931 | 12/10/1931 | 48 days | General | Boiler number D538 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1936 | 08/04/1936 | 45 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1936 | 18/05/1936 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1939 | 15/02/1939 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2269 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1941 | 14/02/1941 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2276 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/01/1943 | 13/02/1943 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1943 | 03/06/1943 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 2272 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 07/09/1944 | 26/09/1944 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/02/1946 | 23/03/1946 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2086 (Diagram 56) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3315 |
||
Gateshead Works | 09/06/1947 | 21/06/1947 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1948 | 11/03/1948 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. | SLS/194806 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1908 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 652 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 531 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
04/1922 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D1380 boiler fitted | ||
25/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1924. Dep: 29/11/1924. | ||
30/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
14/12/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
05/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1927. Dep: 23/02/1928. | ||
28/00/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
26/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1931. Dep: 12/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D538 (Diagram 56) |
||
05/02/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
20/09/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
24/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1936. Dep: 08/04/1936. | ||
28/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/04/1936. Dep: 18/05/1936. | ||
13/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1939. Dep: 15/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2269 (Diagram 56) |
||
08/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1941. Dep: 14/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2276 (Diagram 56) |
||
03/03/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK) | ||
30/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/01/1943. Dep: 13/02/1943. | ||
07/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1943. Dep: 03/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2272 (Diagram 56) |
||
07/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/09/1944. Dep: 26/09/1944. | ||
22/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1946. Dep: 23/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2086 (Diagram 56) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3315 |
||
09/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/06/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947. | ||
04/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
10/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
11/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 11/03/1948. Dep: 11/03/1948. | ||
25/03/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3315 from Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
04/1948 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63315 but not taken up |