Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 890 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14296 Week
» 67312 Month
» 186839 Year
» 3213692 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
46472 |
m/e |
07/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
2164 |
To Service |
During 07/1951 to Darlington (51A) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 16/01/1965 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 6 mths , 17 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/10/1959 |
Chester Northgate MPD |
Chester Northgate (6D) now has an allocation of 10 2-car diesel sets. The final steam allocation was 41215/323, 42303/17/416/7, 75030/52, 84001. Some freight turns are now being worked by Northwich whilst Chester 6A has acquired 46472 (ex N.E.R.) to cover a Northgate turn. |
SLS/196003 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 46472 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2164 Allocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
13/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
22/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (51H) |
|
|
20/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
25/05/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (8E) |
|
|
08/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46472 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|