Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1399 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19202 Week
» 72218 Month
» 191745 Year
» 3218598 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
77001 |
on |
11/02/1954 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/07/1954 |
Darlington Area |
The most interesting news is that the Class 3 engines ex Swindon are now allowed to work over the Darlington-Tebay road, the first one over being No. 77011; she worked the 9.20 a.m. Darlington-Blackpool on (10/7) with 5 bogies and gave a very satisfactory performance: Since that date Nos. 77002 and 77012 have been over the route. No. 77013 arrived in the area on 22/7. No 77001 is now at West Auckland, with B.R. Standard class 2 type, and are proving great favourites with the enginemen in the N.E. region. The class 3 2-6-0's are performing very well over the Darlington-Tebay line, they have that little bit of extra boiler power which can make or mar a loco design. West Auckland men are using them on the Tebay mineral turns, and some change in the working of these trains may take place in the near future. It was a stirring sight to see Nos. 77002/11 double heading a Blackpool E.P. up Sandy Bank, Smardale, last Saturday morning, they were tackling the grade in the region of 40 m.p.h., a bit different to the '901' 2-4-0's, toiling up there in the old days. My father used to fire one of the small Fletcher 2-2-2's on the Kirkby-Tebay trains, and it was a work of art to get the old lady to keep her feet if the rails were at all greasy. The load would be 4-5 six wheelers, and 'Auld John' Stephenson, the driver, used to get 1932 ' at 'em ' over Smardale viaduct in no uncertain manner if he had a chance! The sparks used to fly far and wide till they cleared the cabin at Sandy Bank, sometimes with disastrous effect on lineside crops; self-cleaning smoke boxes are not entirely a new idea! The class 3's take the bank with much less fuss. |
SLS/195410 |
09/09/1963 |
Thornaby MPD (in store) |
The steam allocation here is now in store viz. 60859/946, 65859/84, 67635/40, 68023/39, 76024, 77001/11/4, 90072/81/406/46/51/593. From 9th September (when West Aukland closed) seven type 3 d/es now work all former West Aukland duties. |
SLS/196310 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/02/1954 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 77001 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Darlington (51A ) |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
16/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
14/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
21/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourton (55B) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Farnley Junction (55C) |
|
|
05/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (55F) |
|
|
06/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
01/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
02/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 77001 |
|
|
02/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh |
|
|