|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 15/06/1904 | 01/07/1904 | 17 days | Unclassified | Tender only |
||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1931 | 31/07/1931 | 65 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/10/1933 | 28/11/1933 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2312 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1935 | 10/10/1935 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27460 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1938 | 11/06/1938 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2714 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1940 | 23/10/1940 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 8010 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1943 | 06/03/1943 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 8014 (Diagram 97) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1943 | 31/12/1943 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/03/1945 | 31/03/1945 | 22 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/01/1946 | 09/03/1946 | 50 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/06/1947 | 08/11/1947 | 151 days | General | Boiler number 27531 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/02/1950 | 18/03/1950 | 24 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 64817 |
||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1951 | 28/02/1951 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/05/1951 | 20/06/1951 | 42 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1953 | 09/01/1954 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 27525 (Diagram 97) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/09/1957 | 26/10/1957 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1958 | 16/01/1958 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/11/1958 | 01/12/1958 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1959 | 07/08/1959 | 78 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/01/1961 | 18/02/1961 | 41 days | General | Not repaired Boiler number 27769 (Diagram 97) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Cowlairs Works | On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. | SLS/194710 |
30/11/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Further locos. ex Cowlairs Works that have been noted here during November were: Nos. 1728/45, 1764/6 (green, with 1766 snowplough fitted), 2406/31/64/75, 4574, 4605/39, 4817, 4932, 5924, 7465, 8096, 8471, 8957, 9144/62/73. | SLS/194801 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/06/1904 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1904. Dep: 01/07/1904. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
18/01/1930 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1487 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1489 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 97 boiler fitted |
||
28/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1931. Dep: 31/07/1931. | ||
23/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1933. Dep: 28/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2312 (Diagram 97) |
||
02/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1935. Dep: 10/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27460 (Diagram 97) |
||
22/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
03/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1938. Dep: 11/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2714 (Diagram 97) |
||
12/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1940. Dep: 23/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8010 (Diagram 97) |
||
05/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1943. Dep: 06/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8014 (Diagram 97) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
21/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
01/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/12/1943. Dep: 31/12/1943. | ||
10/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 31/03/1945. | ||
19/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/01/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946. | ||
05/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4817 | ||
11/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1947. Dep: 08/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27531 (Diagram 97) |
||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
23/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 23/02/1950. Dep: 18/03/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 64817 |
||
19/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
07/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
26/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/02/1951. Dep: 28/02/1951. | ||
10/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/05/1951. Dep: 20/06/1951. | ||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
19/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1953. Dep: 09/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27525 (Diagram 97) |
||
19/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northallerton (51J) | ||
06/03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
20/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/09/1957. Dep: 26/10/1957. | ||
07/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1958. Dep: 16/01/1958. | ||
12/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/11/1958. Dep: 01/12/1958. | ||
25/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
22/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/05/1959. Dep: 07/08/1959. | ||
09/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1961. Dep: 18/02/1961. Work undertaken: Not repaired Boiler number 27769 (Diagram 97) |
||
29/03/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64817 from Low Moor (56F) | ||
06/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped |