Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 762 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7151 Week
» 27593 Month
» 364439 Year
» 1586004 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 70 m/e 04/1887
London and North Eastern Railway 8235 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 68235 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class J71
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
J7104/1887
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 04/1887
Withdrawal Mon 07/11/1960
Service Life 73 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1887
DAR Darlington on 01/01/1948
51F West Auckland 5w/e 14/06/1958
   Withdrawn on 07/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51F West Auckland 4w/e 17/05/1958
WDN   on 07/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Darlington Works New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) SLS/194804

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1887 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 70
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 8235    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Darlington (DAR)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 68235    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (51F)    
07/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 68235    

prev prev