Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 57 Today
» 1182 Yesterday
» 4694 Week
» 15987 Month
» 280620 Year
» 1502185 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
NER 1646 m/e 09/1893
LNER (1946) 9418 m/e 12/1946
BR 69418 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N9
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N909/1893
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake
To Service During 09/1893
Withdrawal Mon 01/01/1951
Service Life 57 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1893
AUK West Auckland by 01/01/1923
DAR Darlington on 01/01/1948
54A Sunderland 4w/e 23/09/1950
   Withdrawn on 01/01/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SUN Sunderland w/e 23/07/1949
ALLOC TDK Tyne Dock w/e 30/07/1949
ALLOC 54A Sunderland w/e 27/08/1950
WDN   on 01/01/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
by 1923 Westinghouse Brake fitted
02/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
08/1944 Westinghouse Brake removed
08/1944 Steam Brake fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/01/1943 LNER Notes On 11/1/1943, the 8 a.m. Perth-Edinburgh was hauled by 3401 Bantam Cock, with 9418 Dumbie-dykes as pilot up Glenfarg to Kincross Jc. Two days later 'J.39' 2980 (EFD) worked several locals on the Dundee-Tayport branch. 'K.3's' 1121 and 1106 were noted at Dundee on 30/12 and 3/1 respectively, while a most unusual visitor on 30/12 was 4475 Flying Fox on the 12.40 Aberdeen to Dundee. SLS/194302

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1893 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1646
Built at Darlington Works
   
1923 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
01/01/1923 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - West Auckland (AUK)    
02/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
08/1944 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
08/1944 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9418    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Darlington (DAR)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69418    
23/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
01/01/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 69418    

prev prev