Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 994 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18797 Week
» 71813 Month
» 191340 Year
» 3218193 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
1553 |
m/e |
04/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5077 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
65077 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
KBY |
Kirkby Stephen |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
ALLOC |
AUK |
West Auckland |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/08/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1910 |
Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
08/1910 |
Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
06/1923 |
Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1553 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 147 |
|
|
08/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted from Compound to Simple cylinders |
|
|
08/1910 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with 19" cylinders and Piston Valves |
|
|
06/1923 |
Modification |
Modification: Schmidt pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5077 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
17/07/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (KBY) |
|
|
21/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65077 |
|
|
24/08/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65077 from West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
09/1953 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |
|
|