|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 24/10/1924 | 02/01/1925 | 71 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1927 | 31/08/1927 | 102 days | General | Boiler number D673 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1929 | 08/11/1929 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1932 | 24/02/1932 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1935 | 02/07/1935 | 43 days | General | Boiler number D598 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1938 | 11/11/1938 | 154 days | General | Boiler number 2976 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1941 | 03/07/1941 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1941 | 09/12/1941 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24246 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1944 | 10/03/1944 | 31 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/08/1945 | 05/09/1945 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1946 | 26/10/1946 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3019 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3375 |
||
Darlington Works | 07/02/1948 | 05/03/1948 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 3847 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3375 |
||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1950 | 01/06/1950 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2819 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63375 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1950 | 15/07/1950 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1952 | 16/05/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 24206 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1952 | 27/10/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1952 | 19/11/1952 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1954 | 08/05/1954 | 52 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1955 | 25/03/1955 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24297 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1955 | 01/04/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1957 | 20/12/1957 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24287 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/03/1960 | 28/03/1960 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1961 | 09/09/1961 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24210 (Diagram 50A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Darlington Works | New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) | SLS/194804 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1917 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2218 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
24/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1924. Dep: 02/01/1925. | ||
22/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1927. Dep: 31/08/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D673 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1929. Dep: 08/11/1929. | ||
20/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1932. Dep: 24/02/1932. | ||
27/11/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
09/10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
21/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1935. Dep: 02/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D598 (Diagram 50) |
||
11/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1938. Dep: 11/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2976 (Diagram 50A) |
||
26/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/06/1941. Dep: 03/07/1941. | ||
11/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1941. Dep: 09/12/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24246 (Diagram 50A) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
09/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1944. Dep: 10/03/1944. | ||
14/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/08/1945. Dep: 05/09/1945. | ||
24/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3019 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3375 |
||
07/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1948. Dep: 05/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3847 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3375 |
||
15/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
25/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
02/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1950. Dep: 01/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2819 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63375 |
||
11/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1950. Dep: 15/07/1950. | ||
25/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1952. Dep: 16/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24206 (Diagram 50) |
||
27/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 27/10/1952. Dep: 27/10/1952. | ||
13/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1952. Dep: 19/11/1952. | ||
18/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/03/1954. Dep: 08/05/1954. | ||
01/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1955. Dep: 25/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24297 (Diagram 50A) |
||
29/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/03/1955. Dep: 01/04/1955. | ||
25/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1957. Dep: 20/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24287 (Diagram 50A) |
||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
21/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/03/1960. Dep: 28/03/1960. | ||
10/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1961. Dep: 09/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24210 (Diagram 50A) |
||
10/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
19/08/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63375 from West Auckland (51F) |