|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 23/01/1923 | 12/04/1923 | 80 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/09/1925 | 15/01/1926 | 130 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/09/1927 | 18/10/1927 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1928 | 25/05/1928 | 82 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1929 | 04/10/1929 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1930 | 12/09/1930 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 114 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1932 | 15/01/1933 | 159 days | Rebuilding | |||
Darlington Works | 20/07/1933 | 24/08/1933 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1935 | 04/05/1935 | 53 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/02/1936 | 24/06/1936 | 118 days | Heavy | Boiler number D1287 (Diagram 63) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1938 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Darlington Works | 07/02/1939 | 20/04/1939 | 73 days | General | Boiler number 2456 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/05/1939 | 01/06/1939 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1942 | 06/06/1942 | 47 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1945 | 11/07/1945 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1946 | 23/04/1946 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 24/11/1946 | 07/12/1946 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 07/10/1948 | 05/11/1948 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3905 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69862 |
||
Darlington Works | 28/02/1951 | 06/04/1951 | 38 days | General | Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24705 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1951 | 13/04/1951 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/03/1954 | 01/05/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24768 (Diagram 63B) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1954 | 04/05/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1954 | 14/05/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1956 | 12/12/1956 | 27 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103. Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329. |
SLS/194901 |
31/10/1957 | Sunderland MPD | This shed now has the following A8's 69852/4/5/8/9/62/72/8/89 and in addition 69873/83/93 are sub-shedded at Durham having replaced G5's. | SLS/195711 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1914 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2155 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 63 boiler fitted |
||
23/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1923. Dep: 12/04/1923. | ||
08/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1925. Dep: 15/01/1926. | ||
12/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/09/1927. Dep: 18/10/1927. | ||
02/12/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
05/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1928. Dep: 25/05/1928. | ||
16/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
16/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1929. Dep: 04/10/1929. | ||
26/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
27/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1930. Dep: 12/09/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 114 (Diagram 63A) |
||
10/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 10/08/1932. Dep: 15/01/1933. | ||
20/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/07/1933. Dep: 24/08/1933. | ||
19/06/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
22/08/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (WBY) | ||
13/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1935. Dep: 04/05/1935. | ||
28/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/02/1936. Dep: 24/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1287 (Diagram 63) |
||
30/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/11/1938. | ||
07/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1939. Dep: 20/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2456 (Diagram 63A) |
||
19/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/05/1939. Dep: 01/06/1939. | ||
28/03/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
21/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1942. Dep: 06/06/1942. | ||
07/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
11/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1945. Dep: 11/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2453 (Diagram 63A) |
||
20/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK) | ||
26/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
29/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/03/1946. Dep: 23/04/1946. | ||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9862 | ||
24/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/11/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946. | ||
07/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1948. Dep: 05/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3905 (Diagram 63B) Renumbered to BR 69862 |
||
28/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1951. Dep: 06/04/1951. Work undertaken: Positive lub. drive fitted Boiler number 24705 (Diagram 63B) |
||
10/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/04/1951. Dep: 13/04/1951. | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
05/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
21/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
29/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1954. Dep: 01/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24768 (Diagram 63B) |
||
03/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/05/1954. Dep: 04/05/1954. | ||
07/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/05/1954. Dep: 14/05/1954. | ||
16/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/11/1956. Dep: 12/12/1956. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (54A) | ||
30/07/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69862 from Sunderland (54A) | ||
09/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |