Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 3564 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 34214 Week
» 132859 Month
» 335523 Year
» 3362376 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
50 Co-Co
Old Number |
Company |
Old Num Type |
New Number |
Company |
Subtype |
New Num Type |
|
Date |
Notes |
D436 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50036 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
28/10/1973 |
|
D421 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50021 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
23/11/1973 |
|
D442 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50042 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
01/12/1973 |
|
D415 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50015 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
04/12/1973 |
|
D416 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50016 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
04/12/1973 |
|
D419 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50019 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
13/12/1973 |
|
D423 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50023 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
18/12/1973 |
|
D400 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50050 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
|
D401 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50001 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
|
D412 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50012 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
02/1974 |
|
D404 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50004 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/02/1974 |
|
D411 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50011 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
07/02/1974 |
|
D409 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50009 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
09/02/1974 |
|
D427 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50027 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
09/02/1974 |
|
D403 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50003 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
16/02/1974 |
|
D408 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50008 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
16/02/1974 |
|
D417 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50017 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
16/02/1974 |
|
D420 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50020 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
16/02/1974 |
|
D424 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50024 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
16/02/1974 |
|
D426 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50026 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
16/02/1974 |
|
D428 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50028 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
16/02/1974 |
|
D431 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50031 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
16/02/1974 |
|
D437 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50037 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
16/02/1974 |
|
D440 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50040 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
16/02/1974 |
|
D447 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50047 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
16/02/1974 |
|
D449 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50049 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
16/02/1974 |
|
D425 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50025 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
23/02/1974 |
|
D438 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50038 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
23/02/1974 |
|
D444 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50044 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
23/02/1974 |
|
D432 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50032 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
25/02/1974 |
|
D446 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50046 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
25/02/1974 |
|
D439 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50039 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
on |
26/02/1974 |
|
D429 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50029 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
02/03/1974 |
|
D406 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50006 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
|
D410 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50010 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
|
D448 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50048 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
|
09/03/1974 |
|
D443 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50043 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
16/03/1974 |
|
D418 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50018 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
23/03/1974 |
|
D422 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50022 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
23/03/1974 |
|
D430 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50030 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
23/03/1974 |
|
D434 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50034 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
23/03/1974 |
|
D445 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50045 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
23/03/1974 |
|
D441 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50041 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
27/03/1974 |
|
D435 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50035 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
w/e |
30/03/1974 |
|
D402 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50002 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
04/1974 |
|
D407 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50007 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
04/1974 |
|
D414 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50014 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
04/1974 |
|
D433 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50033 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
04/1974 |
|
D413 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50013 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
m/e |
05/1974 |
|
D405 |
BR |
Pre TOPS |
50005 |
BR |
Tops |
TOPS |
6w/e |
07/09/1974 |
|