Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 501 Today
» 1059 Yesterday
» 501 Week
» 17301 Month
» 333532 Year
» 844634 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

50 Co-Co


BR (Pre Tops) BR (Tops) Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
D400 50050 07/10/1967 WL
D05
82A
OC
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Laira
Withdrawn
07/10/1967
17/06/1968
21/10/1972
11/05/1974
10/04/1976
01/03/1994
01/03/1994
D401 50001 09/12/1967 WL
D05
BR
OC
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Laira
Withdrawn
09/12/1967
17/06/1968
08/07/1973
11/05/1974
10/04/1976
19/04/1991
19/04/1991
D402 50002 23/12/1967 WL
D05
BR
OC
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Laira
Withdrawn
23/12/1967
17/06/1968
10/11/1973
11/05/1974
10/04/1976
09/09/1991
09/09/1991
D403 50003 12/01/1968 WL
D05
BR
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Withdrawn
12/01/1968
17/06/1968
09/03/1974
06/04/1974
15/07/1991
15/07/1991
D404 50004 23/12/1967 WL
D05
OC
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Old Oak Common
Laira
Withdrawn
23/12/1967
17/06/1968
11/05/1974
10/04/1976
22/06/1990
22/06/1990
D405 50005 15/01/1968 WL
D05
BR
OC
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Bristol Bath Road
Old Oak Common
Laira
Withdrawn
15/01/1968
17/06/1968
09/03/1974
11/05/1974
10/04/1976
11/12/1990
11/12/1990
D406 50006 28/03/1968 WL
D05
BR
LA
CD
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Crewe Diesel
Laira
Withdrawn
28/03/1968
17/06/1968
11/05/1974
18/05/1974
25/05/1974
07/02/1976
16/07/1987
16/07/1987
D407 50007 12/03/1968 WL
D05
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Laira
Withdrawn
12/03/1968
17/06/1968
11/05/1974
31/03/1994
31/03/1994
D408 50008 22/03/1968 WL
D05
BR
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Withdrawn
22/03/1968
17/06/1968
10/04/1976
08/05/1976
05/06/1992
05/06/1992
D409 50009 19/03/1968 WL
D05
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Laira
Withdrawn
19/03/1968
17/06/1968
04/05/1974
11/01/1991
11/01/1991
D410 50010 23/02/1968 WL
D05
91W
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
To Western Region / GWR
Laira
Withdrawn
23/02/1968
17/06/1968
28/02/1976
06/03/1976
27/09/1988
27/09/1988
D411 50011 19/03/1968 WL
D05
BR
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Withdrawn
19/03/1968
17/06/1968
09/02/1974
11/05/1974
23/02/1987
23/02/1987
D412 50012 27/03/1968 WL
D05
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Laira
Withdrawn
27/03/1968
17/06/1968
08/05/1976
16/01/1989
16/01/1989
D413 50013 05/03/1968 WL
D05
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Laira
Withdrawn
05/03/1968
17/06/1968
11/05/1974
13/03/1988
13/03/1988
D414 50014 24/04/1968 WL
D05
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Laira
Withdrawn
24/04/1968
17/06/1968
11/05/1974
13/12/1987
13/12/1987
D415 50015 02/04/1968 WL
D05
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Laira
Withdrawn
02/04/1968
17/06/1968
11/05/1974
05/06/1992
05/06/1992
D416 50016 24/04/1968 WL
D05
BR
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Withdrawn
24/04/1968
17/06/1968
11/05/1974
12/04/1975
10/07/1990
10/07/1990
D417 50017 06/04/1968 WL
D05
BR
CD
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Bristol Bath Road
Crewe Diesel
Laira
Withdrawn
06/04/1968
17/06/1968
11/05/1974
25/05/1974
10/01/1976
01/09/1991
01/09/1991
D418 50018 11/04/1968 WL
D05
BR
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Withdrawn
11/04/1968
17/06/1968
11/05/1974
08/05/1976
22/07/1991
22/07/1991
D419 50019 23/04/1968 WL
D05
BR
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Withdrawn
23/04/1968
17/06/1968
11/05/1974
19/07/1975
19/09/1990
19/09/1990
D420 50020 29/04/1968 WL
D05
BR
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Withdrawn
29/04/1968
17/06/1968
04/05/1974
10/05/1975
27/07/1990
27/07/1990
D421 50021 01/05/1968 WL
D05
91W
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
To Western Region / GWR
Laira
Withdrawn
01/05/1968
17/06/1968
10/05/1975
05/06/1988
17/04/1990
17/04/1990
D422 50022 07/05/1968 WL
D05
91W
BR
LA
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
To Western Region / GWR
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Laira
Withdrawn
07/05/1968
17/06/1968
28/02/1976
06/03/1976
08/05/1976
15/05/1988
20/09/1988
20/09/1988
D423 50023 08/05/1968 WL
D05
BR
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Withdrawn
08/05/1968
17/06/1968
11/05/1974
08/05/1976
15/10/1990
15/10/1990
D424 50024 21/05/1968 WL
D05
BR
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Withdrawn
21/05/1968
17/06/1968
11/05/1974
08/05/1976
01/02/1991
01/02/1991
D425 50025 31/05/1968 WL
D05
BR
LA
W
Western Lines (LMR) (New)
Stoke Division
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Withdrawn
31/05/1968
17/06/1968
04/05/1974
11/12/1976
14/08/1989
14/08/1989
D426 50026 12/06/1968 D05
LA
W
Stoke Division (New)
Laira
Withdrawn
12/06/1968
11/05/1974
11/12/1990
11/12/1990
D427 50027 10/06/1968 D05
BR
LA
W
Stoke Division (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Withdrawn
10/06/1968
09/03/1974
06/04/1974
23/07/1991
23/07/1991
D428 50028 18/06/1968 D05
LA
W
Stoke Division (New)
Laira
Withdrawn
18/06/1968
11/05/1974
01/02/1991
01/02/1991
D429 50029 21/06/1968 D05
91W
BR
LA
W
Stoke Division (New)
To Western Region / GWR
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Withdrawn
21/06/1968
28/02/1976
06/03/1976
11/12/1976
25/03/1992
25/03/1992
D430 50030 25/06/1968 D05
BR
LA
W
Stoke Division (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Withdrawn
25/06/1968
11/05/1974
11/12/1976
08/04/1992
08/04/1992
D431 50031 01/07/1968 D05
LA
W
Stoke Division (New)
Laira
Withdrawn
01/07/1968
08/05/1976
01/08/1991
01/08/1991
D432 50032 12/07/1968 D05
BR
LA
W
Stoke Division (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Withdrawn
12/07/1968
11/05/1974
09/10/1976
15/10/1990
15/10/1990
D433 50033 19/07/1968 D05
BR
LA
W
Stoke Division (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Withdrawn
19/07/1968
11/05/1974
09/10/1976
25/03/1994
25/03/1994
D434 50034 24/07/1968 D05
LA
W
Stoke Division (New)
Laira
Withdrawn
24/07/1968
08/05/1976
29/06/1990
29/06/1990
D435 50035 30/09/1968 D05
BR
LA
W
Stoke Division (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Laira
Withdrawn
30/09/1968
10/01/1976
11/12/1976
01/08/1990
01/08/1990
D436 50036 12/08/1968 D05
LA
W
Stoke Division (New)
Laira
Withdrawn
12/08/1968
08/05/1976
12/04/1991
12/04/1991
D437 50037 20/09/1968 D05
BR
W
Stoke Division (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
20/09/1968
11/05/1974
09/09/1991
09/09/1991
D438 50038 16/09/1968 D05
BR
W
Stoke Division (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
16/09/1968
04/05/1974
27/09/1988
27/09/1988
D439 50039 09/09/1968 D05
BR
W
Stoke Division (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
09/09/1968
11/05/1974
04/06/1989
04/06/1989
D440 50040 25/09/1968 D05
BR
CD
BR
W
Stoke Division (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Crewe Diesel
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
25/09/1968
11/05/1974
25/05/1974
10/04/1976
03/08/1990
03/08/1990
D441 50041 03/10/1968 D05
BR
W
Stoke Division (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
03/10/1968
10/01/1976
17/04/1990
17/04/1990
D442 50042 30/09/1968 D05
BR
W
Stoke Division (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
30/09/1968
11/05/1974
01/10/1990
01/10/1990
D443 50043 04/10/1968 D05
BR
W
Stoke Division (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
04/10/1968
11/05/1974
01/02/1991
01/02/1991
D444 50044 11/10/1968 D05
BR
W
Stoke Division (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
11/10/1968
04/05/1974
01/01/1991
01/01/1991
D445 50045 18/10/1968 D05
LA
W
Stoke Division (New)
Laira
Withdrawn
18/10/1968
07/02/1976
11/12/1990
11/12/1990
D446 50046 25/11/1968 D05
BR
W
Stoke Division (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
25/11/1968
11/05/1974
25/03/1992
25/03/1992
D447 50047 05/11/1968 D05
BR
W
Stoke Division (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
05/11/1968
11/05/1974
13/04/1988
13/04/1988
D448 50048 05/12/1968 D05
BR
W
Stoke Division (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
05/12/1968
11/05/1974
15/07/1991
15/07/1991
D449 50049 11/12/1968 D05
BR
W
Stoke Division (New)
Bristol Bath Road
Withdrawn
11/12/1968
11/05/1974
01/08/1991
01/08/1991