Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 501 Today
» 1059 Yesterday
» 501 Week
» 17301 Month
» 333532 Year
» 844634 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

50 Co-Co


Class Number Built Name Name Date Notes Removed Date Withdrawn
50 50050 07/10/1967 Fearless 23/08/1978 Crest added at Laira (no ceremony), November 1980 01/03/1994
50 50001 09/12/1967 Dreadnought 10/04/1978   19/04/1991
50 50002 23/12/1967 Superb 21/03/1978 Crest added at Plymouth Station, November 12th 1980 09/09/1991
50 50003 12/01/1968 Temeraire 09/05/1978   15/07/1991
50 50004 23/12/1967 St Vincent 09/05/1978 Crest added at Paddington Station, September 9th 1988 22/06/1990
50 50005 15/01/1968 Collingwood 05/04/1978 Crest added at Paddington Station, November 21st 1987 11/12/1990
50 50006 28/03/1968 Neptune 25/09/1979   14/07/1987 16/07/1987
50 50007 12/03/1968 Hercules 06/04/1978   05/02/1984 31/03/1994
50 50007 12/03/1968 SIR EDWARD ELGAR 25/04/1984   31/03/1994
50 50008 22/03/1968 Thunderer 01/09/1978 Crest added at Laira (no ceremony), September 20th 1979. Original circular Naval Crest was replaced with a larger, diamond shaped one in August 1986. 02/1992 05/06/1992
50 50009 19/03/1968 Conqueror 08/05/1978   11/01/1991
50 50010 23/02/1968 Monarch 16/03/1978   27/09/1988
50 50011 19/03/1968 Centurion 17/08/1979 Crest added at Paddington on May 17th, 1986 15/02/1987 23/02/1987
50 50012 27/03/1968 Benbow 03/04/1978   16/01/1989
50 50013 05/03/1968 Agincourt 19/04/1978   13/03/1988
50 50014 24/04/1968 Warspite 30/05/1978   13/12/1987
50 50015 02/04/1968 Valiant 21/04/1978   02/1992 05/06/1992
50 50016 24/04/1968 Barham 03/04/1978   10/07/1990
50 50017 06/04/1968 Royal Oak 24/04/1978   01/09/1991
50 50018 11/04/1968 Resolution 06/04/1978   22/07/1991
50 50019 23/04/1968 Ramillies 18/04/1978   19/09/1990
50 50020 29/04/1968 Revenge 07/07/1978   27/07/1990
50 50021 01/05/1968 Rodney 31/07/1978   17/04/1990
50 50022 07/05/1968 Anson 20/04/1978   05/1988 20/09/1988
50 50023 08/05/1968 Howe 17/05/1978   15/10/1990
50 50024 21/05/1968 Vanguard 15/05/1978   01/02/1991
50 50025 31/05/1968 Invincible 06/06/1978 Crest added at Plymouth Station, May 7th 1981 08/1989 14/08/1989
50 50026 12/06/1968 Indomitable 29/03/1978   11/12/1990
50 50027 10/06/1968 Lion 17/04/1978   23/07/1991
50 50028 18/06/1968 Tiger 10/05/1978   01/02/1991
50 50029 21/06/1968 Renown 26/10/1978   25/03/1992
50 50030 25/06/1968 Repulse 10/04/1978   08/04/1992
50 50031 01/07/1968 Hood 28/06/1978 Crest added at Old Oak Common, April 22nd 1983 01/08/1991
50 50032 12/07/1968 Courageous 07/07/1978 Crest added at Devonport Dockyard, Plymouth, October 12th 1986. Nameplates specially painted blue for the ceremony. 15/10/1990
50 50033 19/07/1968 Glorious 26/06/1978   25/03/1994
50 50034 24/07/1968 Furious 06/04/1978   07/1990 29/06/1990
50 50035 30/09/1968 Ark Royal 17/01/1978 1st one named. Crests added at Laira two days later 01/08/1990
50 50036 12/08/1968 Victorious 16/05/1978   12/04/1991
50 50037 20/09/1968 Illustrious 08/06/1978 Crest added at Newcastle Central Station, May 27th 1982 09/09/1991
50 50038 16/09/1968 Formidable 05/05/1978   27/09/1988
50 50039 09/09/1968 Implacable 20/06/1978   04/06/1989
50 50040 25/09/1968 Leviathan 15/09/1978   06/1987 03/08/1990
50 50040 25/09/1968 Centurion 08/07/1987   08/1990 03/08/1990
50 50041 03/10/1968 Bulwark 08/05/1978   17/04/1990
50 50042 30/09/1968 Triumph 10/04/1978   01/10/1990
50 50043 04/10/1968 Eagle 26/06/1978   01/02/1991
50 50044 11/10/1968 Exeter 27/04/1978 Crest added at Exeter St Davids Station, August 20th 1981 01/01/1991
50 50045 18/10/1968 Achilles 12/04/1978   11/12/1990
50 50046 25/11/1968 Ajax 11/10/1978 Crest added at Plymouth Station, April 12th 1985 25/03/1992
50 50047 05/11/1968 Swiftsure 26/05/1978   13/04/1988
50 50048 05/12/1968 Dauntless 16/03/1978   15/07/1991
50 50049 11/12/1968 Defiance 02/05/1978   08/1991 01/08/1991