Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1888 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19691 Week
» 72707 Month
» 192234 Year
» 3219087 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D448 |
05/12/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50048 |
09/03/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Dauntless |
16/03/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 02/1978 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/12/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/12/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D448 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50048 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
04/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
02/1978 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
16/03/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Dauntless' at Reading Station |
|
|
15/07/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50048 |
|
|
29/04/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|