Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 336 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18139 Week
» 71155 Month
» 190682 Year
» 3217535 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D447 |
05/11/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50047 |
16/02/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Swiftsure |
26/05/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/11/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/11/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D447 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
16/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50047 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
04/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
26/05/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Swiftsure' at Laira |
|
|
13/04/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50047 |
|
|
05/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|