Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 640 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6424 Week
» 27813 Month
» 147340 Year
» 3174193 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D419 |
23/04/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50019 |
13/12/1973 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Ramillies |
18/04/1978 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/1980 |
|
Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/04/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
by 06/1980 |
xesh |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control, Headlight |
BR AWS |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/04/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D419 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
13/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50019 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
19/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
18/04/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Ramillies' at Laira |
|
|
06/1980 |
Modification |
Modification: Headlight(s) fitted |
|
|
19/09/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50019 |
|
|