Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1890 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19693 Week
» 72709 Month
» 192236 Year
» 3219089 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D404 |
23/12/1967 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50004 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
St Vincent |
09/05/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/12/1967 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/12/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D404 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50004 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
10/04/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
09/05/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'St Vincent' at Laira |
|
|
22/06/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50004 |
|
|
05/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|