Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 501 Today
» 1059 Yesterday
» 501 Week
» 17301 Month
» 333532 Year
» 844634 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

50 Co-Co


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
07/10/1967 To Service 400   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
09/12/1967 To Service 401   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
23/12/1967 To Service 402   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
23/12/1967 To Service 404   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
12/01/1968 To Service 403   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
15/01/1968 To Service 405   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
23/02/1968 To Service 410   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
05/03/1968 To Service 413   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
12/03/1968 To Service 407   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
19/03/1968 To Service 409   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
19/03/1968 To Service 411   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
22/03/1968 To Service 408   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
27/03/1968 To Service 412   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
28/03/1968 To Service 406   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
02/04/1968 To Service 415   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
06/04/1968 To Service 417   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
11/04/1968 To Service 418   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
23/04/1968 To Service 419   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
24/04/1968 To Service 414   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
24/04/1968 To Service 416   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
29/04/1968 To Service 420   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
01/05/1968 To Service 421   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
07/05/1968 To Service 422   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
08/05/1968 To Service 423   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
21/05/1968 To Service 424   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
31/05/1968 To Service 425   NEW WL Western Lines (LMR)  
10/06/1968 To Service 427   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
12/06/1968 To Service 426   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 400 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 401 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 402 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 403 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 404 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 405 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 406 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 407 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 408 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 409 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 410 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 411 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 412 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 413 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 414 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 415 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 416 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 417 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 418 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 419 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 420 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 421 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 422 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 423 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 424 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
17/06/1968 Reallocation 425 WL Western Lines (LMR) D05 Stoke Division  
18/06/1968 To Service 428   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
21/06/1968 To Service 429   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
25/06/1968 To Service 430   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
01/07/1968 To Service 431   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
12/07/1968 To Service 432   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
19/07/1968 To Service 433   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
24/07/1968 To Service 434   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
12/08/1968 To Service 436   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
09/09/1968 To Service 439   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
16/09/1968 To Service 438   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
20/09/1968 To Service 437   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
25/09/1968 To Service 440   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
30/09/1968 To Service 435   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
30/09/1968 To Service 442   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
03/10/1968 To Service 441   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
04/10/1968 To Service 443   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
11/10/1968 To Service 444   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
18/10/1968 To Service 445   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
05/11/1968 To Service 447   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
25/11/1968 To Service 446   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
05/12/1968 To Service 448   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
11/12/1968 To Service 449   NEW D05 Stoke Division  
21/10/1972 Reallocation 400 D05 Stoke Division 82A Bristol Bath Road  
08/07/1973 Reallocation 50001 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
10/11/1973 Reallocation 50002 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
09/02/1974 Reallocation 50011 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
09/03/1974 Reallocation 50003 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
09/03/1974 Reallocation 405 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
09/03/1974 Reallocation 50027 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
06/04/1974 Reallocation 50003 BR Bristol Bath Road LA Laira  
06/04/1974 Reallocation 50027 BR Bristol Bath Road LA Laira  
04/05/1974 Reallocation 50009 D05 Stoke Division LA Laira  
04/05/1974 Reallocation 50020 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
04/05/1974 Reallocation 50025 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
04/05/1974 Reallocation 50038 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
04/05/1974 Reallocation 50044 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50050 82A Bristol Bath Road OC Old Oak Common  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50001 BR Bristol Bath Road OC Old Oak Common  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50002 BR Bristol Bath Road OC Old Oak Common  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50004 D05 Stoke Division OC Old Oak Common  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 405 BR Bristol Bath Road OC Old Oak Common  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50006 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50007 D05 Stoke Division LA Laira  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50011 BR Bristol Bath Road LA Laira  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50013 D05 Stoke Division LA Laira  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50014 D05 Stoke Division LA Laira  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50015 D05 Stoke Division LA Laira  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50016 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50017 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50018 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50019 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50023 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50024 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50026 D05 Stoke Division LA Laira  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50028 D05 Stoke Division LA Laira  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50030 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50032 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50033 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50037 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50039 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50040 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50042 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50043 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50046 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50047 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50048 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
11/05/1974 Reallocation 50049 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
18/05/1974 Reallocation 50006 BR Bristol Bath Road LA Laira  
25/05/1974 Reallocation 50006 LA Laira CD Crewe Diesel  
25/05/1974 Reallocation 50017 BR Bristol Bath Road CD Crewe Diesel  
25/05/1974 Reallocation 50040 BR Bristol Bath Road CD Crewe Diesel  
12/04/1975 Reallocation 50016 BR Bristol Bath Road LA Laira  
10/05/1975 Reallocation 50020 BR Bristol Bath Road LA Laira  
10/05/1975 Reallocation 50021 D05 Stoke Division 91W To Western Region / GWR  
19/07/1975 Reallocation 50019 BR Bristol Bath Road LA Laira  
10/01/1976 Reallocation 50017 CD Crewe Diesel LA Laira  
10/01/1976 Reallocation 50035 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
10/01/1976 Reallocation 50041 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
07/02/1976 Reallocation 50006 CD Crewe Diesel LA Laira  
07/02/1976 Reallocation 50045 D05 Stoke Division LA Laira  
28/02/1976 Reallocation 50010 D05 Stoke Division 91W To Western Region / GWR  
28/02/1976 Reallocation 50022 D05 Stoke Division 91W To Western Region / GWR  
28/02/1976 Reallocation 50029 D05 Stoke Division 91W To Western Region / GWR  
06/03/1976 Reallocation 50010 91W To Western Region / GWR LA Laira  
06/03/1976 Reallocation 50022 91W To Western Region / GWR BR Bristol Bath Road  
06/03/1976 Reallocation 50029 91W To Western Region / GWR BR Bristol Bath Road  
10/04/1976 Reallocation 50050 OC Old Oak Common LA Laira  
10/04/1976 Reallocation 50001 OC Old Oak Common LA Laira  
10/04/1976 Reallocation 50002 OC Old Oak Common LA Laira  
10/04/1976 Reallocation 50004 OC Old Oak Common LA Laira  
10/04/1976 Reallocation 50005 OC Old Oak Common LA Laira  
10/04/1976 Reallocation 50008 D05 Stoke Division BR Bristol Bath Road  
10/04/1976 Reallocation 50040 CD Crewe Diesel BR Bristol Bath Road  
08/05/1976 Reallocation 50008 BR Bristol Bath Road LA Laira  
08/05/1976 Reallocation 50012 D05 Stoke Division LA Laira  
08/05/1976 Reallocation 50018 BR Bristol Bath Road LA Laira  
08/05/1976 Reallocation 50022 BR Bristol Bath Road LA Laira  
08/05/1976 Reallocation 50023 BR Bristol Bath Road LA Laira  
08/05/1976 Reallocation 50024 BR Bristol Bath Road LA Laira  
08/05/1976 Reallocation 50031 D05 Stoke Division LA Laira  
08/05/1976 Reallocation 50034 D05 Stoke Division LA Laira  
08/05/1976 Reallocation 50036 D05 Stoke Division LA Laira  
09/10/1976 Reallocation 50032 BR Bristol Bath Road LA Laira  
09/10/1976 Reallocation 50033 BR Bristol Bath Road LA Laira  
11/12/1976 Reallocation 50025 BR Bristol Bath Road LA Laira  
11/12/1976 Reallocation 50029 BR Bristol Bath Road LA Laira  
11/12/1976 Reallocation 50030 BR Bristol Bath Road LA Laira  
11/12/1976 Reallocation 50035 BR Bristol Bath Road LA Laira  
23/02/1987 Condemned 50011 LA Laira   COND  
16/07/1987 Condemned 50006 LA Laira   COND  
13/12/1987 Condemned 50014 LA Laira   COND  
13/03/1988 Condemned 50013 LA Laira   COND  
13/04/1988 Condemned 50047 BR Bristol Bath Road   COND  
15/05/1988 Reallocation 50022 LA Laira LA Laira  
05/06/1988 Reallocation 50021 91W To Western Region / GWR LA Laira  
20/09/1988 Condemned 50022 LA Laira   COND  
27/09/1988 Condemned 50010 LA Laira   COND  
27/09/1988 Condemned 50038 BR Bristol Bath Road   COND  
16/01/1989 Condemned 50012 LA Laira   COND  
04/06/1989 Condemned 50039 BR Bristol Bath Road   COND  
14/08/1989 Condemned 50025 LA Laira   COND  
17/04/1990 Condemned 50021 LA Laira   COND  
17/04/1990 Condemned 50041 BR Bristol Bath Road   COND  
22/06/1990 Condemned 50004 LA Laira   COND  
29/06/1990 Condemned 50034 LA Laira   COND  
10/07/1990 Condemned 50016 LA Laira   COND  
27/07/1990 Condemned 50020 LA Laira   COND  
01/08/1990 Condemned 50035 LA Laira   COND  
03/08/1990 Condemned 50040 BR Bristol Bath Road   COND  
19/09/1990 Condemned 50019 LA Laira   COND  
01/10/1990 Condemned 50042 BR Bristol Bath Road   COND  
15/10/1990 Condemned 50023 LA Laira   COND  
15/10/1990 Condemned 50032 LA Laira   COND  
11/12/1990 Condemned 50005 LA Laira   COND  
11/12/1990 Condemned 50026 LA Laira   COND  
11/12/1990 Condemned 50045 LA Laira   COND  
01/01/1991 Condemned 50044 BR Bristol Bath Road   COND  
11/01/1991 Condemned 50009 LA Laira   COND  
01/02/1991 Condemned 50024 LA Laira   COND  
01/02/1991 Condemned 50028 LA Laira   COND  
01/02/1991 Condemned 50043 BR Bristol Bath Road   COND  
12/04/1991 Condemned 50036 LA Laira   COND  
19/04/1991 Condemned 50001 LA Laira   COND  
15/07/1991 Condemned 50003 LA Laira   COND  
15/07/1991 Condemned 50048 BR Bristol Bath Road   COND  
22/07/1991 Condemned 50018 LA Laira   COND  
23/07/1991 Condemned 50027 LA Laira   COND  
01/08/1991 Condemned 50031 LA Laira   COND  
01/08/1991 Condemned 50049 BR Bristol Bath Road   COND  
01/09/1991 Condemned 50017 LA Laira   COND  
09/09/1991 Condemned 50002 LA Laira   COND  
09/09/1991 Condemned 50037 BR Bristol Bath Road   COND  
25/03/1992 Condemned 50029 LA Laira   COND  
25/03/1992 Condemned 50046 BR Bristol Bath Road   COND  
08/04/1992 Condemned 50030 LA Laira   COND  
05/06/1992 Condemned 50008 LA Laira   COND  
05/06/1992 Condemned 50015 LA Laira   COND  
01/03/1994 Condemned 50050 LA Laira   COND  
25/03/1994 Condemned 50033 LA Laira   COND  
31/03/1994 Condemned 50007 LA Laira   COND