Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2021 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19824 Week
» 72840 Month
» 192367 Year
» 3219220 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D441 |
03/10/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50041 |
27/03/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Bulwark |
08/05/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 12/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/10/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/10/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D441 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3811 Allocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
27/03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50041 |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
08/05/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Bulwark' at Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
17/04/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50041 |
|
|
06/07/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Coopers Metals: at Old Oak Common |
|
|