Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 4247 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17653 Week
» 70669 Month
» 190196 Year
» 3217049 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D445 |
18/10/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50045 |
23/03/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Achilles |
12/04/1978 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/10/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1900 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|
18/10/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D445 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
23/03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50045 |
|
|
07/02/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
12/04/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Achilles' at Laira |
|
|
11/12/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50045 |
|
|