Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 683 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6467 Week
» 27856 Month
» 147383 Year
» 3174236 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D402 |
23/12/1967 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50002 |
04/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Superb |
21/03/1978 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1970 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/12/1967 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
03/1970 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS, Multiple Working fitted |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/12/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D402 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
10/11/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50002 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
10/04/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
21/03/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Superb' at Laira |
|
|
04/1978 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
09/09/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50002 |
|
|