Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1607 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7391 Week
» 28780 Month
» 148307 Year
» 3175160 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D435 |
30/09/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50035 |
30/03/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Ark Royal |
17/01/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 08/1976 |
|
Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/09/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/09/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D435 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3805 Allocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
30/03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50035 |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
08/1976 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (metal sheeting painted yellow with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
11/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
17/01/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Ark Royal' at Plymouth Station |
|
|
01/08/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50035 |
|
|