Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1325 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14731 Week
» 67747 Month
» 187274 Year
» 3214127 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D400 |
07/10/1967 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50050 |
02/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Fearless |
23/08/1978 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1970 |
|
Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/10/1967 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
03/1970 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS, Multiple Working fitted |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/10/1967 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D400 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3770 Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Multiple Working Fitted |
|
|
21/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50050 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
10/04/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
23/08/1978 |
Naming |
Named 'Fearless' at Plymouth Station |
|
|
01/03/1994 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50050 |
|
|