Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 4304 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17710 Week
» 70726 Month
» 190253 Year
» 3217106 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D411 |
19/03/1968 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
50011 |
07/02/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
Centurion |
17/08/1979 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/03/1968 |
xes |
Dual brakes, Electric Train Heating, Slow Speed Control |
BR AWS |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/03/1968 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D411 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
07/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 50011 |
|
|
09/02/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
17/08/1979 |
Naming |
Named 'Centurion' at Laira |
|
|
23/02/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 50011 |
|
|
11/09/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Texas Metals: at Crewe Works |
|
|