Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 501 Today
» 1059 Yesterday
» 501 Week
» 17301 Month
» 333532 Year
» 844634 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

50 Co-Co


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Thu 11/04/1968 D415 WL   Failed between Carlisle and Braidwood on the up "Mid Day Scot" RCTS 6/1968  
Sat 13/04/1968 D405,
D409,
D415
WL,
WL,
WL
  Polmadie depot: Stabled on Polmadie depot
Polmadie depot: Stabled on Polmadie depot
Polmadie depot: Stabled on Polmadie depot
RCTS 6/1968  
Thu 25/04/1968 D401 WL   Derailed at Eglinton St station Glasgow while working the down "Royal Scot". Came to grief on facing points. RCTS 6/1968  
Tue 27/08/1968 D434,
D436
D05,
D05
  Perth depot: Around the area - On the shed
Perth depot: Around the area - On the shed
RO 12/1968  
Sun 05/01/1969 D404,
D427
D05,
D05
  Crewe North depot: Stabled in depot
Crewe North depot: Stabled in depot
RO 9/1969  
Sun 05/01/1969 D406 D05   Crewe North depot: At Crewe station RO 9/1969  
Sun 13/07/1969 D407,
D420,
D425,
D426,
D431,
D440,
D442,
D443,
D447
D05,
D05,
D05,
D05,
D05,
D05,
D05,
D05,
D05
  Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
Polmadie Depot visit: On Polmadie shed.
RO 10/1969  
Sat 26/07/1969 D409 D05   Allerton shed: Open Day - Exhibited RO 9/1969  
Sun 27/07/1969 D400 D05   Crewe Works visit: Erecting shop - collision damage RO 9/1969  
Fri 20/08/1971 D430 D05   Polmadie depot.: Around the shed. - Inside the shed - blue with full yellow ends. Keith Long  
Mon 27/12/1971 D405,
D406,
D407,
D408,
D410,
D414,
D415,
D416,
D422,
D428,
D433,
D441,
D446
D05,
D05,
D05,
D05,
D05,
D05,
D05,
D05,
D05,
D05,
D05,
D05,
D05
  Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
Stabled at Crewe Diesel depot: Stabled on Crewe Diesel depot
RO 517  
Sun 30/01/1972 D402,
D411,
D413,
D416
D05,
D05,
D05,
D05
  Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Erecting shop.
Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Arrival sidings.
RO 4/1972  
Sat 15/04/1972 D422 D05   Polmadie depot: On shed    
Sun 27/07/1975 50008 D05   At Crewe station - Running light