Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 909 Today
» 4616 Yesterday
» 31559 Week
» 130204 Month
» 332868 Year
» 3359721 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
GER/LNER Holden "J69" Class 0-6-0T
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
|
|
renumbered to |
LNER |
8561 |
1946 |
y/e |
0000 |
|
GER |
189 |
renumbered to |
GER |
305 |
2nd |
m/e |
01/1909 |
|
GER |
408 |
renumbered to |
GER |
12 |
2nd |
m/e |
01/1920 |
|
GER |
410 |
renumbered to |
GER |
14 |
2nd |
m/e |
01/1920 |
|
GER |
411 |
renumbered to |
GER |
15 |
2nd |
m/e |
01/1920 |
|
GER |
414 |
renumbered to |
GER |
18 |
2nd |
m/e |
01/1920 |
|
GER |
12 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7012 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
14 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7014 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
15 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7015 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
160 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7160 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
162 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7162 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
163 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7163 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
165 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7165 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
166 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7166 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
167 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7167 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
168 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7168 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
18 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7018 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
190 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7190 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
191 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7191 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
192 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7192 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
193 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7193 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
194 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7194 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
195 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7195 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
196 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7196 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
197 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7197 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
198 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7198 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
203 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7203 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
258 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7258 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
261 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7261 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
262 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7262 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
265 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7265 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
266 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7266 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
267 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7267 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
268 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7268 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
269 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7269 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
270 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7270 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
271 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7271 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
272 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7272 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
273 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7273 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
274 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7274 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
305 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7305 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
327 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7327 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
328 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7328 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
329 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7329 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
331 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7331 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
332 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7332 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
333 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7333 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
334 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7334 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
335 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7335 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
336 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7336 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
337 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7337 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
338 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7338 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
339 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7339 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
340 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7340 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
341 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7341 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
342 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7342 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
343 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7343 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
344 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7344 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
345 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7345 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
346 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7346 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
347 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7347 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
348 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7348 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
349 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7349 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
350 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7350 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
351 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7351 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
352 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7352 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
353 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7353 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
354 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7354 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
355 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7355 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
356 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7356 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
357 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7357 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
358 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7358 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
359 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7359 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
360 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7360 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
361 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7361 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
362 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7362 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
363 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7363 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
364 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7364 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
365 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7365 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
366 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7366 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
367 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7367 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
368 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7368 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
369 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7369 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
370 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7370 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
371 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7371 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
372 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7372 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
373 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7373 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
374 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7374 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
375 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7375 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
376 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7376 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
377 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7377 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
378 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7378 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
379 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7379 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
380 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7380 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
381 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7381 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
382 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7382 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
383 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7383 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
384 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7384 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
385 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7385 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
386 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7386 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
387 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7387 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
388 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7388 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
389 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7389 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
390 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7390 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
391 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7391 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
392 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7392 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
393 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7393 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
394 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7394 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
395 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7395 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
396 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7396 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
398 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7398 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
400 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7400 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
401 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7401 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
51 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7051 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
52 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7052 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
53 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7053 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
54 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7054 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
55 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7055 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
56 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7056 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
57 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7057 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
58 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7058 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
59 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7059 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
60 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7060 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
81 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7081 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
82 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7082 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
83 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7083 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
84 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7084 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
85 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7085 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
86 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7086 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
87 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7087 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
88 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7088 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
89 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7089 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
GER |
90 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
7090 |
1924 |
y/e |
1924 |
|
LNER |
7258 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8585 |
1946 |
on |
16/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
7269 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8577 |
1946 |
on |
21/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
7261 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8587 |
1946 |
on |
22/01/1946 |
|
LNER |
7360 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8537 |
1946 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
|
LNER |
7268 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8576 |
1946 |
on |
09/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
7380 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8556 |
1946 |
on |
09/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
7262 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8588 |
1946 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
7273 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8581 |
1946 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
7335 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8497 |
1946 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
7336 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8498 |
1946 |
on |
17/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
7329 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8492 |
1946 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
|
LNER |
7087 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8633 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7190 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8597 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7191 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8598 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7192 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8599 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7193 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8600 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7359 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8536 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7372 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8548 |
1946 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
|
LNER |
7195 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8602 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
7265 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8573 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
7270 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8578 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
7337 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8499 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
7363 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8540 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
7367 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8543 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
7373 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8549 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
7386 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8562 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
7387 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8563 |
1946 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
|
LNER |
7083 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8629 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
7361 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8538 |
1946 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
|
LNER |
7057 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8623 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
7267 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8575 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
7389 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8565 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
7395 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8571 |
1946 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
|
LNER |
7015 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8520 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
7351 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8528 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
7358 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8535 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
7377 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8553 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
7382 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8558 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
7383 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8559 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
7392 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8568 |
1946 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
|
LNER |
7052 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8618 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7059 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8625 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7082 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8628 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7086 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8632 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7089 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8635 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7090 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8636 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7160 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8607 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7163 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8610 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7165 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8612 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7166 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8613 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7194 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8601 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7196 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8603 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7198 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8605 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7203 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8591 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7305 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8596 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7327 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8490 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7328 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8491 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7331 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8494 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7332 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8495 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7352 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8529 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7357 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8534 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7365 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8541 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7366 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8542 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7370 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8546 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7371 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8547 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7375 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8551 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7379 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8555 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7384 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8560 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7394 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8570 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7396 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8572 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7398 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8510 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7400 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8512 |
1946 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
|
LNER |
7060 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8626 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
7162 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8609 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
7266 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8574 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
7334 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8496 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
7338 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8500 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
7340 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8502 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
7347 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8524 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
7354 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8531 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
7368 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8544 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
7369 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8545 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
7374 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8550 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
7376 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8552 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
7381 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8557 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
7390 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8566 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
7401 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8513 |
1946 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
|
LNER |
7014 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8519 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
7341 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8503 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
7342 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8504 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
7343 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8505 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
7345 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8507 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
7346 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8508 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
7349 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8526 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
7355 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8532 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
7378 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8554 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
7391 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8567 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
7393 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8569 |
1946 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
|
LNER |
7018 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8522 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
7051 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8617 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
7271 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8579 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
7339 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8501 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
7350 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8527 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
7353 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8530 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
7356 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8533 |
1946 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
|
LNER |
7012 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8517 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
|
LNER |
7053 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8619 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
|
LNER |
7055 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8621 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
|
LNER |
7084 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8630 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
|
LNER |
7085 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8631 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
|
LNER |
7348 |
renumbered to |
LNER |
8525 |
1946 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
|
LNER |
8529 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68529 |
|
m/e |
03/1948 |
|
LNER |
8491 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68491 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
8537 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68537 |
|
m/e |
04/1948 |
|
LNER |
8602 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68602 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
8613 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68613 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LNER |
8552 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68552 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
8567 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68567 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
8598 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68598 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LNER |
8603 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68603 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
8635 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68635 |
|
m/e |
07/1948 |
|
LNER |
8498 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68498 |
|
m/e |
08/1948 |
|
LNER |
8524 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68524 |
|
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
LNER |
8499 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68499 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
8526 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68526 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
8535 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68535 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
8573 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68573 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
8581 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68581 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
8605 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68605 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
8621 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68621 |
|
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
LNER |
8542 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68542 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
8545 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68545 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
8565 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68565 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
8591 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68591 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
8600 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68600 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
8609 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68609 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
8618 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68618 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
8631 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68631 |
|
m/e |
11/1948 |
|
LNER |
8501 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68501 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
8507 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68507 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
8520 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68520 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
8541 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68541 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
8557 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68557 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
8572 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68572 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
8607 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68607 |
|
m/e |
12/1948 |
|
LNER |
8569 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68569 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
8633 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68633 |
|
m/e |
01/1949 |
|
LNER |
8496 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68496 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
8540 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68540 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
8549 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68549 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
8563 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68563 |
|
m/e |
02/1949 |
|
LNER |
8559 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68559 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
8577 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68577 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
8585 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68585 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LNER |
8547 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68547 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
8558 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68558 |
|
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
LNER |
8533 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68533 |
|
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
LNER |
8596 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68596 |
|
m/e |
05/1949 |
|
LNER |
8513 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68513 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
8531 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68531 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
8536 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68536 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
8543 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68543 |
|
m/e |
06/1949 |
|
LNER |
8551 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68551 |
|
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
LNER |
8578 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68578 |
|
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
LNER |
8612 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68612 |
|
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
LNER |
8630 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68630 |
|
m/e |
07/1949 |
|
LNER |
8544 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68544 |
|
m/e |
08/1949 |
|
LNER |
8560 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68560 |
|
m/e |
08/1949 |
|
LNER |
8587 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68587 |
|
m/e |
08/1949 |
|
LNER |
8597 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68597 |
|
m/e |
08/1949 |
|
LNER |
8576 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68576 |
|
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
LNER |
8599 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68599 |
|
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
LNER |
8538 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68538 |
|
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
LNER |
8553 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68553 |
|
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
LNER |
8556 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68556 |
|
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
LNER |
8629 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68629 |
|
m/e |
10/1949 |
|
LNER |
8503 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68503 |
|
m/e |
12/1949 |
|
LNER |
8548 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68548 |
|
m/e |
12/1949 |
|
LNER |
8571 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68571 |
|
m/e |
12/1949 |
|
LNER |
8617 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68617 |
|
m/e |
12/1949 |
|
LNER |
8508 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68508 |
|
m/e |
01/1950 |
|
LNER |
8530 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68530 |
|
m/e |
01/1950 |
|
LNER |
8626 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68626 |
|
m/e |
01/1950 |
|
LNER |
8527 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68527 |
|
m/e |
02/1950 |
|
LNER |
8570 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68570 |
|
m/e |
02/1950 |
|
LNER |
8625 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68625 |
|
m/e |
02/1950 |
|
LNER |
8510 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68510 |
|
m/e |
03/1950 |
|
LNER |
8522 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68522 |
|
m/e |
03/1950 |
|
LNER |
7385 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68561 |
|
m/e |
04/1950 |
|
LNER |
8519 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68519 |
|
m/e |
04/1950 |
|
LNER |
8490 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68490 |
|
m/e |
05/1950 |
|
LNER |
8502 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68502 |
|
m/e |
05/1950 |
|
LNER |
8550 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68550 |
|
m/e |
05/1950 |
|
LNER |
8492 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68492 |
|
m/e |
06/1950 |
|
LNER |
8554 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68554 |
|
m/e |
09/1950 |
|
LNER |
8628 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68628 |
|
m/e |
09/1950 |
|
LNER |
8566 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68566 |
|
m/e |
10/1950 |
|
LNER |
8555 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68555 |
|
w/e |
04/11/1950 |
|
LNER |
8636 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68636 |
|
w/e |
11/11/1950 |
|
LNER |
8532 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68532 |
|
w/e |
25/11/1950 |
|
LNER |
8497 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68497 |
|
w/e |
09/12/1950 |
|
LNER |
8588 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68588 |
|
w/e |
09/12/1950 |
|
LNER |
8601 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68601 |
|
w/e |
09/12/1950 |
|
LNER |
8495 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68495 |
|
w/e |
30/12/1950 |
|
LNER |
8505 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68505 |
|
m/e |
02/1951 |
|
LNER |
8512 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68512 |
|
m/e |
02/1951 |
|
LNER |
8517 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68517 |
|
m/e |
02/1951 |
|
LNER |
8494 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68494 |
|
m/e |
03/1951 |
|
LNER |
8500 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68500 |
|
m/e |
03/1951 |
|
LNER |
8534 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68534 |
|
m/e |
04/1951 |
|
LNER |
8610 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68610 |
|
m/e |
04/1951 |
|
LNER |
8623 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68623 |
|
m/e |
04/1951 |
|
LNER |
8575 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68575 |
|
m/e |
06/1951 |
|
LNER |
8574 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68574 |
|
m/e |
07/1951 |
|
LNER |
8632 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68632 |
|
m/e |
07/1951 |
|
LNER |
8528 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68528 |
|
m/e |
10/1951 |
|
LNER |
8546 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68546 |
|
m/e |
11/1951 |
|
LNER |
8562 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68562 |
|
m/e |
11/1951 |
|
LNER |
8579 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68579 |
|
m/e |
01/1952 |
|
LNER |
8504 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68504 |
|
m/e |
05/1952 |
|
LNER |
8619 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68619 |
|
m/e |
06/1953 |
|
LNER |
8568 |
renumbered to |
BR |
68568 |
|
m/e |
04/1956 |
|
BR |
68532 |
renumbered to |
DP |
43 |
Dept |
m/e |
01/1959 |
|
BR |
68498 |
renumbered to |
DP |
44 |
Dept |
m/e |
08/1959 |
|
BR |
68543 |
renumbered to |
DP |
45 |
Dept |
m/e |
11/1959 |
|